Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Old Republic National Title Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Dean Witter Capital I Inc. Trust 2003-NC2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2003-NC2 and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, Old Republic Title Insurance Group, Inc. and Old Republic Title Company of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2021cv01466
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dragon, Lindsay)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #14 Response by Defendant Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ORNTICs Insurer license, #2 Exhibit B - Old Republic Title Company of Nevadas Agency license) (Gizer, Scott)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/28/2021. (Gizer, Scott)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, Old Republic Title Company of Nevada, Old Republic Title Insurance Group, Inc. answer due 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Lau, Sophia)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Responses due by 9/21/2021. (Miller, Christina)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Old Republic Title Insurance Group, Inc. served on 8/27/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Old Republic National Title Insurance Company served on 8/25/2021. (Miller, Christina)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Lau, Sophia)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Old Republic Title Company of Nevada served on 8/18/2021. (Miller, Christina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #5 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Scott E. Gizer and Sophia S. Lau. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Lau, Sophia)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation, Corporate Parent Old Republic Title Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Old Republic National Title Insurance Company for Old Republic National Title Insurance Company added. (Lau, Sophia)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/6/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/21/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-21-839034-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6585768) by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint pp. 1-260, #2 Exhibit Complaint pp. 261-573, #3 Exhibit Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 6, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Old Republic National Title Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Dean Witter Capital I Inc. Trust 2003-NC2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2003-NC2
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay Dragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Company of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?