Stewart v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Laquade Stewart
Defendant: Calvin Johnson and The State of Nevada
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2021cv01490
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Schedule for further proceedings. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kimberly Anne Sandberg on behalf of Petitioner Tommy Laquade Stewart. (Sandberg, Kimberly)
September 17, 2021 Attorney update in case: Attorney Rene Valladares withdrawn from the case. (Sandberg, Kimberly)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 RECEIPT of Payment: $5.00, receipt number NVLAS076986. (MR)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Calvin Johnson. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Chapman, Trisha)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Tommy Laquade Stewart. (Granted per #3 Order.) (MR)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Tommy Laquade Stewart. (MR)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court separately file #1 -1 the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #1 -2 the Motion for Appointment of Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #1 -2 the Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. FPD is appointed to represent Stewart. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court add Aaron Ford, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for the respondents. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Calvin Johnson, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:21-cv-01490-APG-BNW. (MR)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Tommy Laquade Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #3 Envelope) (MR)
August 9, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (YAW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Laquade Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Trisha Chapman
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?