Branch-Noto et al v. Sisolak et al
Plaintiff: Monica Branch-Noto and Tiffany Paulson
Defendant: Stephen F. Sisolak, Aaron Darnell Ford and Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2021cv01507
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 Motion for Permanent Injunction by Defendant Clark County School District. Replies due by 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - October 4, 2021 SNHD report, #3 Exhibit B - The Science of Masking to Control COVID-18, CDC, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Dept. of Ed. Strategies for Safely Reopening Schools, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Monica Cortez, #6 Exhibit E - CCSD's Mask Policy, #7 Exhibit F - CCSD Physical Education Policy) (Hendricks, Kara)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hendricks, Kara)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Clark County School District. Responses due by 10/22/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - October 4, 2021 SNHD report, #3 Exhibit B - The Science of Masking to Control COVID-18, CDC, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Dept. of Ed. Strategies for Safely Reopening Schools, #5 Exhibit D - CCSD's Mask Policy) (Hendricks, Kara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Branch-Noto. Clark County School District served on 9/20/2021. (Chattah, Sigal)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Branch-Noto. (Chattah, Sigal)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Branch-Noto. Aaron Darnell Ford served on 9/20/2021. (Chattah, Sigal)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs move for injunctive relief on an emergency basis #8 . Local Rule 7-4 governs emergency motions and requires a declaration setting forth, inter alia, "[t]he office addresses and telephone number of... all affected parties," along with "[a] statement of movant certifying... when and how the other affected people or entities were notified of the motion or, if not notified, why it was not practicable to do so." L.R. 7-4(a). "Failure to comply with the requirements for submitting an emergency motion may result in denial of the motion." L.R. 7-4(c). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the request for emergency treatment is denied for failure to provide this required information and because plaintiffs acknowledge that, "[a]t this juncture, there is no longer an Emergency...." ECF No. 8 at 2. Accordingly, the briefing schedule in Local Rule 7-2(b) applies to this motion. The record also does not reflect that any defendant has been served in this case either with process or the motion, as no certificate of service was attached to the motion. So IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs must file proof of service of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #8 on all defendants by September 24, 2021. (no image attached) (chambers order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD) Modified on 9/22/2021 to correct proof of service deadline (DC).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiffs Monica Branch-Noto, Tiffany Paulson. Responses due by 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Chattah, Sigal)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/20/2021. Order Denying Motion Without Prejudice Based on Noncompliance with Local Rules. Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction #6 exceeds this court's 24-page limit without permission to do so. See L.R. 7-3(b) (setting 24-page limit for all motions except those for summary judgment). Local Rule 7-3(c) states that "A motion to exceed these page limits must be filed before the motion or brief is due and must be accompanied by a declaration stating in detail the reasons for, and number of, additional pages requested...." Plaintiffs did not comply with this rule. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction #6 is DENIED without prejudice to its refiling in compliance with the rules of this court. Plaintiffs are cautioned that the rule also states that permission to exceed page limits "will not be routinely granted" and requires "a showing of good cause"; motions to exceed page limits "must not be styled as an ex parte or emergency motion" and may not exceed three pages. L.R. 7-3(c). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Monica Branch-Noto, Tiffany Paulson. Responses due by 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit) (Chattah, Sigal)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Monica Branch-Noto that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Chattah, Sigal)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clark County School District re #1 Complaint. (YAW)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aaron Darnell Ford re #1 Complaint. (YAW)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stephen F. Sisolak re #1 Complaint. (YAW)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6593070) by MONICA BRANCH-NOTO. Proof of service due by 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chattah, Sigal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (YAW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch-Noto et al v. Sisolak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Branch-Noto
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Joseph S. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Paulson
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Joseph S. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Sisolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Darnell Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?