West Coast Life Insurance Company v. Blake et al
Plaintiff: West Coast Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael Blake and Estate of Patricia L. Blake
Case Number: 2:2021cv01584
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Blake. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/5/2021.(Notice re consent to email service mailed to Deft this date - DRS) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Life Insurance Company re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Michael Blake served on 10/1/2021. (Dove, Kelly)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Blake. (DRS)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Michael Blake by Plaintiff West Coast Life Insurance Company. (Dove, Kelly)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Estate of Patricia L. Blake. (DRS)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Estate of Patricia L. Blake by Plaintiff West Coast Life Insurance Company. (Dove, Kelly)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by West Coast Life Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Dai-ichi Life Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Protective Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Protective Life Corporation for West Coast Life Insurance Company added. (Dove, Kelly)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6611439) by West Coast Life Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dove, Kelly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast Life Insurance Company v. Blake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Patricia L. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?