Chanstapornkul v. Sisolak
Plaintiff: Sithipong Chanstapornkul
Defendant: Stephen F. Sisolak
Case Number: 2:2021cv01589
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/14/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #6 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Stephen F. Sisolak. Responses due by 10/28/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2021. (Gebrael, Natasha) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sithipong Chanstapornkul re #1 Complaint. Stephen F. Sisolak served on 9/23/2021. (EDS)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stephen F. Sisolak. (DRS)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen F. Sisolak (Filing fee $402) by Sithipong Chanstapornkul. Proof of service due by 11/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt NVLAS077095) (NEF mailed to P this date with Notice and consent to email forms - DRS) Modified file date 8/30/2021
August 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanstapornkul v. Sisolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sithipong Chanstapornkul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Sisolak
Represented By: Natasha M. Gebrael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?