Rodrigues Lorador et al v. Kolev et al
Plaintiff: Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador and Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador
Defendant: Michelle Kolev, Nicole Kolev, Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group, Treasure Island LLC and Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01650
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc., Michelle Kolev, Nicole Kolev, Treasure Island LLC. Replies due by 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B - Videos, #2 Exhibit C Declaration of Michelle Kolec, #3 Exhibit D Compendium II, #4 Exhibit E Copyright Office Circular, #5 Exhibit F Table of Performances) (Terry, Brian)
November 2, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc., Michelle Kolev, Nicole Kolev, Treasure Island LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Terry, Brian)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group, Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B - Videos, #2 Exhibit C Compendium II, #3 Exhibit D Copyright Office Circular, #4 Exhibit E Table of Performances) (Terry, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group (Martinez, Tabetha)
October 13, 2021 Party Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group terminated pursuant to #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismssal. (DKJ)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc., Michelle Kolev, Nicole Kolev, Treasure Island LLC on 10/12/2021 executed by Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador re #11 Amended Complaint, #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Martinez, Tabetha)
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc. re #11 Amended Complaint. (MR)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Cirque Du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc. by Plaintiffs Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador. (Hardy, Brian)
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Michelle Kolev, Nicole Kolev, Treasure Island LLC, Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group, Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc. by Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador. Adds new parties. (Hardy, Brian)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador re #3 Summons Issued. Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group served on 9/13/2021. (Martinez, Tabetha)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador re #3 Summons Issued. Nicole Kolev served on 9/14/2021. (Martinez, Tabetha)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador re #3 Summons Issued. Michelle Kolev served on 9/14/2021. (Martinez, Tabetha)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador re #3 Summons Issued. Treasure Island LLC served on 9/9/2021. (Martinez, Tabetha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiffs Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Object: DVD, Volume(s): 1, Description: Exhibits 4 & 5, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits 4 and 5 Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 5) (Martinez, Tabetha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador, Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador. Responses due by 9/22/2021. (Martinez, Tabetha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group, Michelle Kolev, Nicole Kolev, Treasure Island LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6624199) by Marco Lorador, Paulo Lorador. Proof of service due by 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michelle Kolev, #3 Summons Nichole Kolev, #4 Summons Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group, #5 Summons Treasure Island LLC) (Martinez, Tabetha) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 8, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodrigues Lorador et al v. Kolev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Paulo Rodrigues Lorador
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Philip Kantor
Represented By: Tabetha Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulo Renato Rodrigues Lorador
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Philip Kantor
Represented By: Tabetha Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Kolev
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Kolev
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirque Du Soleil Entertainment Group
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Island LLC
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirque du Soleil Nevada Newco, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?