White v. TK Elevator Corporation
Plaintiff: Nathan White
Defendant: TK Elevator Corporation and Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv01696
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant TK Elevator Corporation. (Mastrangelo, Rebecca)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by TK Elevator Corporation. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/8/2021.(Mastrangelo, Rebecca) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nathan White that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. for Nathan White added. (Shook, John)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant TK Elevator Corporation. (Mastrangelo, Rebecca)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TK Elevator Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Corporate Parent TK Elevator Americas Corporation, Corporate Parent TK Elevator USA Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent TK Elevator U.S. Newco, Inc., Corporate Parent TK Elevator Newco GmbH, Corporate Parent TK Elevator Midco GmbH, Corporate Parent TK Elevator Holdco GmbH, Corporate Parent TK Elevator Topco GmbH, Corporate Parent Vertical Topco II SA, Corporate Parent Vertical Topco I SA, Corporate Parent Vertical Midco Sarl, Corporate Parent thyssnkrupp AG, Corporate Parent Vertical Topco Sarl for TK Elevator Corporation added. (Mastrangelo, Rebecca)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/14/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/29/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-839739-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6631431) by TK Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration) (Mastrangelo, Rebecca) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. TK Elevator Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mastrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mastrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan White
Represented By: John B. Shook
Represented By: Robert L. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?