Kretschmer v. Vegas411 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hugh Kretschmer
Defendant: Vegas411 LLC, Situation Marketing, Photovision Enterprises, Inc. and Damian Bazadona
Case Number: 2:2021cv01723
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 33 AO 121 - REPORT on the determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (HAM)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 16, 2022 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer. (Rothell, Trey)
June 15, 2022 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/15/2022. Before the Court is the #29 Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer representing that Plaintiff and Defendant Vegas411, LLC are in the process of finalizing a settlement. The parties expect to submit dismissal documents by July 11, 2022. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file dismissal documents no later than July 11, 2022, or else a joint status report informing the Court of the status of settlement.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in light of the parties' settlement, all currently pending deadlines between them are VACATED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EH)
June 13, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Settlement by Hugh Kretschmer. (Green, Ronald)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Griffith H Hayes withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 12, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Griffith H. Hayes, NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Vegas411 LLC. (Pocci, Marisa) Modified event on 5/13/2022 pursuant to LR IA 11-6 (SLD).
March 28, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #24 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Re: #24 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Discovery due by 11/21/2022. Motions due by 12/21/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 24, 2022 Filing 24 Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer. (Rothell, Trey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/11/2022. Re: #22 Proposed joint discovery plan and scheduling order. Having reviewed the parties' joint discovery plan and scheduling order, the Court finds that it fails to comply with the Local Rules. Despite captioning the plan with "SUBMITTED IN COMPLIANCE WITH LR 26-1(b)," the parties' plan seeks a discovery period in excess of 180 days, fails to provide the number of days required for discovery and provides no explanation of why a longer discovery period is necessary. The parties also include an interim status report deadline. However, the Local Rules of Practice for the District of Nevada were amended and adopted on April 17, 2020 to remove the interim status report deadline requirement. The parties are directed to review the amendments, specifically Local Rule 26-1 and re-file a compliant discovery plan. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties' stipulated discovery plan (ECF No. 9) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit an amended proposed discovery plan and scheduling order by March 25, 2022. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
March 10, 2022 Filing 22 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer. (Rothell, Trey)
March 10, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Trey Alan Rothell on behalf of Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer. (Rothell, Trey)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation; Plaintiff's deadline to file a motion to strike affirmative defenses is hereby continued from February 14, 2022 to March 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 11, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) For Plaintiff to File a Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses re #17 Answer to Complaint, by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer. (Green, Ronald)
January 25, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vegas411 LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Disaster Holdings LLC for Vegas411 LLC added. (Hayes, Griffith)
January 24, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by Vegas411 LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/10/2022.(Hayes, Griffith) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation. The default entered against Defendant, Vegas411 LLC is set aside. Defendant shall have until January 24, 2022, to file and serve its Answer. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Stipulation by Defendant Vegas411 LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hayes, Griffith)
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #13 . ERROR: Document does not comply with Local Rule IA 6-2. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #13 . (no image attached) (MR)
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 View Corrected Image #15 as to STIPULATION To Set Aside Default and Order re #11 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Vegas411 LLC. (Hayes, Griffith)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 12, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 SET ASIDE per #16 Order. (SLD) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vegas411 LLC re #10 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (SLD) Modified on 1/18/2022 (SLD).
December 16, 2021 Party Photovision Enterprises, Inc. terminated pursuant to #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (YAW)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer. Responses due by 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Green, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavits of Service) (Green, Ronald)
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer. (Green, Ronald)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hugh Kretschmer re #1 Complaint,,,. Vegas411 LLC served on 9/20/2021. (Green, Ronald)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hugh Kretschmer re #1 Complaint. Damian Bazadona served on 9/24/2021. (Green, Ronald) Modified service date on 12/17/2021 (SLD).
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Hugh Kretschmer of Defendants Damian G. Bazadona, and Situation Marketing without prejudice, (Green, Ronald)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (HAM)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Form AO 121 by Hugh Kretschmer. (Randazza, Marc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint (HAM)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hugh Kretschmer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Randazza, Marc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6635708) by Hugh Kretschmer. Proof of service due by 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit Evidence of Defendants' copyright infringement, #3 Exhibit Letters sent to Defendants re Plaintiff's copyright claims, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons First Defendant, #6 Summons Second Defendant, #7 Summons Third Defendant, #8 Summons Fourth Defendant) (Randazza, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kretschmer v. Vegas411 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Kretschmer
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc Randazza
Represented By: Trey Alan Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vegas411 LLC
Represented By: Scott H. Barbag
Represented By: Griffith H Hayes
Represented By: Marisa A Pocci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Situation Marketing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Photovision Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Bazadona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?