Ford v. Johnson et al
Petitioner: Damien Kytrell Ford
Respondent: Calvin Johnson and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2021cv01742
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Damien Kytrell Ford. (SMR)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff is to file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the filing fee in full on or before 11/15/2021. The Clerk shall supply proper IFP form and instructions. (Attachments: #1 IFP packet for dissemination through law library) Signed By Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/1/2021 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 10/1/2021 to include signed by and date signed (DKJ).
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Calvin Johnson, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:21-cv-01742. (KR)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Damien Kytrell Ford. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (KR)
September 22, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damien Kytrell Ford
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?