Dowe v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawnae Dowe
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Flagstar Bank and Synchrony Financial doing business as Syncb/Care Credit
Case Number: 2:2021cv01751
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Motion to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 12/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 19, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Synchrony Financial.(Tsai, Matthew)
November 10, 2021 Party Flagstar Bank terminated Pursuant to #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. (DKJ)
November 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Shawnae Dowe. of Flagstar Bank, FSB (Avalos, Gerardo)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Gordon, Benjamin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/5/2021.(Gordon, Benjamin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawnae Dowe re #3 Summons Issued. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/30/2021. (Haines, George)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawnae Dowe re #3 Summons Issued. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 9/30/2021. (Haines, George)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Extend Time. Flagstar Bank answer due 11/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Flagstar Bank. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. Synchrony Financial answer due 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Flagstar Bank that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp Inc., Other Affiliate MP Thrift Investments L.P. for Flagstar Bank added. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Flagstar Bank. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Synchrony Financial that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Synchrony Bank for Synchrony Financial added. (Tsai, Matthew)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Synchrony Financial. (Tsai, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawnae Dowe re #3 Summons Issued. Flagstar Bank served on 9/30/2021. (Haines, George)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawnae Dowe re #3 Summons Issued. Synchrony Financial served on 9/30/2021. (Kind, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Flagstar Bank, Synchrony Financial. (JQC)
September 23, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shawnae Dowe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6640722) by Shawnae Dowe. Proof of service due by 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowe v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnae Dowe
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Represented By: Benjamin Bradwell Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Financial doing business as Syncb/Care Credit
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?