Underwood v. O-Reilly Auto Parts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Underwood
Defendant: O-Reilly Auto Parts, Inc., Illinois Tool Works, Inc., The Blaster Corporation, CRC Industries, Inc., Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., Highland Stores, Inc., 7-Eleven, Inc., Richard D. Haley, Autozone Stores, LLC, Amrep, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Ashland, LLC, Sunnyside Corporation, W.M. Barr & Company, Inc., Technical Chemical Company, Highland Stores, Inc. doing business as Bi-Rite, Autozone Stores, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Incorporated doing business as CarQuest Auto Parts and Ashland, LLC doing business as Valvoline
Case Number: 2:2021cv01766
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to #19 Response by Plaintiff Tyler Underwood. (Marcek, Cliff)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Underwood. Amrep, Inc. served on 11/4/2021; Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. served on 11/2/2021; Technical Chemical Company served on 11/5/2021; The Blaster Corporation served on 11/4/2021. (Marcek, Cliff)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE re #23 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by attorney Melissa Roose. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Counsel is advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. The Clerk has now entered the interested parties. No further action is required at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 7-Eleven, Inc. SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company, Seven-Eleven Japan Co., Ltd., and Seven & i Holdings Co., Ltd. added. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Roose, Melissa) Modified on 11/9/2021 to add Interested Parties (SLD).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment re #21 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/24/2021. (Roose, Melissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss, by Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. Responses due by 11/23/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/24/2021. (Roose, Melissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Richard D. Haley. (Roose, Melissa)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Remand to Agency by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. Replies due by 11/12/2021. (Abbott, Steven)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Tyler Underwood. Replies due by 11/8/2021. (Marcek, Cliff)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Underwood. 7-Eleven, Inc. served on 10/19/2021; Advance Stores Company, Incorporated served on 10/19/2021; Ashland, LLC served on 10/19/2021; Autozone Stores, LLC served on 10/19/2021; CRC Industries, Inc. served on 10/19/2021; Illinois Tool Works, Inc. served on 10/19/2021. (Marcek, Cliff)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Tyler Underwood. (Marcek, Cliff)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (Abbott, Steven)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #13 filed by attorney Cliff W. Marcek. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion Miscellaneous to Motion Remand to State Court. No further action is required at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal, by Plaintiff Tyler Underwood. Responses due by 11/5/2021. (Marcek, Cliff) Modified event on 10/22/2021 (SLD).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Richard D. Haley. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Roose, Melissa)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Richard D. Haley. Responses due by 11/1/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/2/2021. (Roose, Melissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (Abbott, Steven)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (Abbott, Steven)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (Abbott, Steven)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00, receipt number NVLAS077546. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties) (JQC)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/12/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required regarding ECF No. #1 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected and the filing fee was not paid.Attorney Steven Abbott is advised to pay the filing fee of $402.00 by either mailing it or bringing it to the Clerk's Office during normal business hours, Monday - Friday, 9 am - 4 pm. This filing fee can not be paid online now since the wrong event was used. (no image attached) (SLD)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Clean Harbors, Inc. for Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. added. (Abbott, Steven)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Notice of Manual Filing by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (Abbott, Steven)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Removal, NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. Object: Notice of Removal, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Abbott, Steven) Modified event on 9/24/2021 (SLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood v. O-Reilly Auto Parts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Underwood
Represented By: Cliff W. Marcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O-Reilly Auto Parts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blaster Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B Abbott
Represented By: Darrell D. Dennis
Represented By: Steven L. Foremaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Roose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Haley
Represented By: Melissa Roose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrep, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyside Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.M. Barr & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technical Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Stores, Inc. doing business as Bi-Rite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated doing business as CarQuest Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland, LLC doing business as Valvoline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?