Cohan v. Brown, et al
Defendant: James E Cohan, Judge Brown, Clark County Deputy District Attorney and Metropolitan Police Officer
Case Number: 2:2021cv01807
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying as moot #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and GRANTING #3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 12/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 11/12/2021 (EDS).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James E Cohan. (YAW)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (YAW)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James E Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (YAW)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Deputy District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?