Burris et al v. Spinelli et al
Plaintiff: Jazmine Tranese Burris and Cory Lamon Morris
Defendant: Lucia Virginia Spinelli, Hertz Vehicles LLC and The Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv01812
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jacob Leavitt. (Leavitt, Jacob)
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/28/2022. Motions due by 4/27/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/4/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #16 Status Report by Plaintiffs Jazmine Tranese Burris, Cory Lamon Morris. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Leavitt, Jacob)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jazmine Tranese Burris, Cory Lamon Morris. (Leavitt, Jacob)
November 2, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #16 . ERROR: Joint Status Report is not signed by both parties on page 2. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #16 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 VIEW #19 corrected image First STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Jazmine Tranese Burris, Cory Lamon Morris. (Leavitt, Jacob)
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion by Defendant Hertz Vehicles LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Clark, Troy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 Motion by Plaintiffs Jazmine Tranese Burris, Cory Lamon Morris. Replies due by 11/2/2021. (Leavitt, Jacob)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacob Leavitt on behalf of Plaintiffs Jazmine Tranese Burris, Cory Lamon Morris. (Leavitt, Jacob)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Show Cause Why This Action Should Not be Remanded For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. I ORDER that the order to show cause (ECF No. #6 ) is satisfied, and I will not remand this action to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Hertz Vehicles LLC. (Clark, Troy)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jazmine Tranese Burris, Cory Lamon Morris. Replies due by 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Berrett, Joshua)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua P Berrett on behalf of Plaintiff Jazmine Tranese Burris. and NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacob G Leavitt (Berrett, Joshua)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for a to Enforce Reasonable Service Deadline by Defendant Hertz Vehicles LLC. Responses due by 10/27/2021. (Clark, Troy) Modified event on 10/13/2021 (DKJ).
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Hertz Vehicles LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Demand) (Clark, Troy)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendant Hertz Vehicles LLC shall show cause, in writing, as to why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by 10/29/2021 will result in remand to the state court.Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hertz Vehicles LLC. (Clark, Troy)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/30/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/15/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 30, 2021 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (YAW)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hertz Vehicles LLC. Responses due by 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Motion to Enlarge Time for Service, #3 Exhibit Order) (Clark, Troy)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hertz Vehicles LLC, Lucia Virginia Spinelli, The Hertz Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number Eight Judicial District Court, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6649694) by Hertz Vehicles LLC, Lucia Virginia Spinelli, The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Demand For Jury Trial, #4 Exhibit Ex Parte Motion for Elargement of Time, #5 Exhibit Ex Parte Motion for Elargement of Timr, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Enlarge Time for Service, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #8 Exhibit Defendants' Notice of Appearance, #9 Exhibit Defendants' Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris et al v. Spinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmine Tranese Burris
Represented By: Jacob Leavitt
Represented By: Joshua P Berrett
Represented By: Kimball Joseph Jones
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Lamon Morris
Represented By: Jacob Leavitt
Represented By: Joshua P Berrett
Represented By: Kimball Joseph Jones
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucia Virginia Spinelli
Represented By: Troy Clark
Represented By: Najum Anwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Vehicles LLC
Represented By: Troy Clark
Represented By: Najum Anwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Troy Clark
Represented By: Najum Anwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?