Barnett v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeffrey P. Barnett
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv01817
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security by Jeffrey P. Barnett. No changes to parties. (Marcus, Meredith)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402, receipt number NVLAS078252 (HAM)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying #11 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/8/2021. Pending before the Court is a motion to extend, Docket No. 12, which is GRANTED. The deadline to pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis is EXTENDED to November 15, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to pay the filing fee (amended) re #4 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, by Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Barnett. (Marcus, Meredith)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Marcus, Meredith)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/3/2021. On October 1, 2021, the Court issued an order noting (among other things) that the complaint violated the local rules, including the formatting requirement for filings to be on numbered pleading paper. Docket No. 4 at 1-2 n.2. Now pending before the Court is a motion to extend, which similarly fails to comply with the local rules. Docket No. 9. Accordingly, the motion to extend is DENIED without prejudice. Counsel must promptly familiarize herself with the rules of this Court and is expected to comply with them moving forward. Any amended motion to extend must be filed by November 5, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to pay the filing fee re #4 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, by Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Barnett. (Marcus, Meredith)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Meredith E. Marcus and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, 6 Minute Order,, for attorney Meridith E. Marcus, by Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Barnett. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert.Admission Illinois, #2 Exhibit Cert.GoodStanding.Michigan) (Taylor, Hal)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/2021. Pending before the Court is a petition to appear pro hac vice. Docket No. 2. Although Ms. Marcus identifies an admission to the bar of the state of Michigan, see id. at 6, she has not attached a certificate of good standing from Michigan, but see id. at 2 (a certificate of good standing must be provided for "each" state in which the applicant has been admitted). A notice of corrected image must be filed by October 19, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NJK)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jeffrey P. Barnett. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff must either file a new IFP motion curing the deficiencies noted or Pay the filing fees in full on or before 11/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (EDS)
October 1, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 View Corrected Image #7 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Meredith E. Marcus and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6650085) by Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert.Admission Illinois) (Taylor, Hal) Modified on 10/7/2021 (EDS).
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons USAG, #4 USM-285-USAG, #5 Summons USAO, #6 USM-285-USAO, #7 Summons OGC, #8 USM-285-ORC) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey P. Barnett
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Meredith E. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?