Sotolongo v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Beth A Sotolongo
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01825
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (SLD)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beth A Sotolongo. United States of America served on 10/20/2021. (Ladah, Ramzy)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America re #1 Complaint. (MR)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Beth A Sotolongo. (Ladah, Ramzy)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #2 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Ramzy P. Ladah and Donald P. Paradiso. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 10/22/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (MR)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Beth A Sotolongo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ladah, Ramzy)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICA UNITED STATES OF (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6652169) by Beth A Sotolongo. Proof of service due by 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Ladah, Ramzy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 1, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sotolongo v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth A Sotolongo
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Represented By: Donald P. Paradiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?