Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust and Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Defendant: Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training and Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01849
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Henry Wright on behalf of Defendant Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training. (Wright, John)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. Responses due by 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael A. Urban, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Default) (Urban, Michael) Modified on 11/24/2021 (EDS).
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Urban, Michael)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training. (JQC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Urban, Michael)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6656777) by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund. Proof of service due by 1/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Urban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 6, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?