Benson v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Troy Benson
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Joseph Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2021cv01928
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. (Crosby, Nicholas)
December 6, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Troy Benson. Replies due by 12/13/2021. (McLetchie, Margaret)
December 3, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #28 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 8/8/2022. Motions due by 9/7/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #27 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 2, 2021 Filing 28 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Troy Benson. (Wolpert, Leo)
December 2, 2021 Filing 27 Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Troy Benson. (Wolpert, Leo)
December 2, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Leo S Wolpert on behalf of Plaintiff Troy Benson. (Wolpert, Leo)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List; Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to remove attorney Anjan Gewali from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff Troy Benson. (McLetchie, Margaret)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Stipulation; Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/7/2022 at 10:00 AM. Early neutral evaluation statements Brief due by 2/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 18, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Early Neutral Evaluation Session by Plaintiff Troy Benson. (McLetchie, Margaret) Modified on 11/18/2021 (EDS).
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. (Crosby, Nicholas)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/17/2022 at 10:00 AM. The ENE will be conducted remotely by video. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation Re: #10 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Remove Attorney Alina M. Shell from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to remove attorney Alina M. Shell from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff Troy Benson. (McLetchie, Margaret)
November 5, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Troy Benson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McLetchie, Margaret)
November 5, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Troy Benson. (McLetchie, Margaret) Modified on 11/5/2021 (EDS).
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (McLetchie, Margaret)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to remove attorney Alina M. Shell from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff Troy Benson. (Shell, Alina)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/16/2021.(Crosby, Nicholas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. Responses due by 11/15/2021. (Crosby, Nicholas)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. (Crosby, Nicholas)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (Crosby, Nicholas)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/20/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/4/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (HAM)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 11/10/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 20, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Crosby, Nicholas)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-837506-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6670115) by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crosby, Nicholas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Benson
Represented By: Alina M Shell
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Represented By: Anjan Gewali
Represented By: Leo S Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lombardo
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?