Blessing-Alvarado v. Geico Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Tania Blessing-Alvarado
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01952
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. Responses due by 11/15/2021. (Carlson, Jonathan)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/25/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/9/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geico Indemnity Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Geico Indemnity Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-840104-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6676057) by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blessing-Alvarado v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tania Blessing-Alvarado
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Frank A. Toddre, II
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Tayler D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?