Winkler v. Roshak et al
Plaintiff: Geoff Winkler
Defendant: William Roshak individually and d/b/a William George Photography, Melissa Roshak and Tetiana Luzhanska
Nominal Defendant: Tina Leiss
Case Number: 2:2021cv02000
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
3 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Melissa Roshak answer due 1/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 16, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Melissa Roshak. (Fitts, Stewart) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (MR).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Reassign Case - Case reassigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah no longer assigned to the case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-2000-JAD-BNW. Signed by Judges James C. Mahan and Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 13, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Reassign Case by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Gall, Maria)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation for Substitution of counsel. Stewart C Fitts added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] Order on Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Melissa Roshak. (Fitts, Stewart)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Reassign Case by Defendants Tetiana Luzhanska, William Roshak. Replies due by 12/13/2021. (Ryan, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tetiana Luzhanska, William Roshak. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ryan, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Tetiana Luzhanska, William Roshak. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/20/2022.(Ryan, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Reassign Case by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Gall, Maria)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:21-cv-01298 by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Gall, Maria)
November 23, 2021 Party Tina Leiss (as Executive Officer of the Public Employees' Retirement System of Nevada) terminated pursuant to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (YAW)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoff Winkler re #1 Complaint,,. William Roshak served on 11/15/2021. (Gall, Maria)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoff Winkler re #1 Complaint,,. Tetiana Luzhanska served on 11/15/2021. (Gall, Maria)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. of Nominal Defendant Tina Leiss (Gall, Maria)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Stipulatio Re: #1 Complaint, Melissa Roshak answer due 12/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant Melissa Roshak to respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Gall, Maria)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Acceptance of Service (Melissa Roshak) by Geoff Winkler re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. (Gall, Maria)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tina Leiss, Tetiana Luzhanska, Melissa Roshak, William Roshak re #1 Complaint. (YAW)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tina Leiss, Tetiana Luzhanska, Melissa Roshak, William Roshak (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6688821) by Geoff Winkler. Proof of service due by 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Melissa Roshak, #4 Summons Tetiana Luzhanska, #5 Summons Tina Leiss, #6 Summons William Roshak) (Gall, Maria) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 4, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (YAW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkler v. Roshak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoff Winkler
Represented By: Maria A. Gall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Roshak individually and d/b/a William George Photography
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Represented By: Scott A. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Roshak
Represented By: Stewart C Fitts
Represented By: John T. Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetiana Luzhanska
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Represented By: Scott A. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Tina Leiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?