Devose v. Hutchings et al
Petitioner: Christopher Devose
Respondent: William Hutchings and Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2021cv02069
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Christopher Devose. (Attachments: #1 Petition Part 2, #2 Petition Part 3) (KF)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCREENING ORDER. Clerk is to detach and file Petition [1-1, 1-2, 1-3]. The Petition is DISMISSED without Prejudice. Petitioner has 30 days to file and Amended Petition. Failure to do so will result in this action being dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/27/2021. (copy of Petition and copy of Courts 2254 Habeas Corpus Petition sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00. Receipt number NVLAS078902. (KF)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 petitioner's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis without having to prepay the full filing fee. Petitioner has 30 days from the date this order is ENTERED to have the $5.00 filing fee sent to the Clerk. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. Payment of filing fee due 1/7/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE from USDC advising case against William Hutchings, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:21-cv-22069-APG-DJA. (DRS)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Christopher Devose. (DRS)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Christopher Devose. (Attachments: #1 Petition part 1 of 3, #2 Petition part 2 of 3, #3 Petition part 3 of 3) (DRS)
November 18, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devose v. Hutchings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Devose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?