PlayUp, Inc. v. Mintas
Plaintiff: PlayUp, Inc.
Defendant: PlayUp Ltd.
Petitioner: Dennis Drazin
Counter Claimant: Laila Mintas
Counter Defendant: Daniel Simic
Not Classified By Court: Feridun Mintas
Case Number: 2:2021cv02129
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss and/or Strike, #147 , #148 , are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court DISMISSES the following counterclaims against PlayUp US WITHOUT prejudice: Abuse of Process; False Light; Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress; Promissory Estoppel; Fraud; Contractual Breach of the Implied Covenant; Unjust Enrichment. The Court DISMISSES the Declaratory Judgment counterclaim against PlayUp US WITH prejudice. The Court DENIES the Motion as to the following counterclaims: Defamation Per Se; Violation of 29 U.S.C. 206, 207; Violation of NRS 608.016, 608.140; Nev. Const. Art. 15, 16 and NRS 608.250; Violation of NRS 608.018, 608.140. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages, #146 , #165 , are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Denying #291 Motion for Protective Order and Denying #311 Motion to Take Deposition. ORDER Granting #317 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ORDER Denying as Moot #320 Stipulation. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to update the docket with the address provided for PlayUp Inc. and Daniel Simic. In light of the current status, the Court VACATES the current case management and briefing deadlines. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #317 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Counter Defendants PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic, Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Popok in Support of Motion to Withdraw)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/13/2023. Pending before the Court is motion to withdraw as counsel. Docket No. 317. The addresses provided for the pertinent clients include an abbreviation for "NSW" and do not specify a country. E.g., id. at 5. Although the Court could likely guess that information, withdrawing counsel must instead provide a complete address for the pertinent clients. Accordingly, a notice of corrected image must be filed by March 14, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 320 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response re #311 Motion to Take Deposition,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer) (extend) (nondispositive)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 319 RESPONSE to #317 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 3/10/2023. (Braster, Jennifer)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/2/2023. Pending before the Court is a motion to withdraw as counsel for PlayUp, Inc. and Simic. Docket No. 317. Any response thereto must be filed by March 3, 2023, and any reply must be filed by March 6, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael S. Popok for Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendants PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic. Responses due by 3/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Popok In Support of Motion to Withdraw)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court DENIES without prejudice PlayUp,Inc.'s and Daniel Simic's motion for a protective order, Docket No. #312 , motion for sanctions, Docket No. #313 , and motion to shorten time, Docket No. #314 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to File Document re #182 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 by Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 3/14/2023. (Markwell, Meredith) (presiding)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MOTION to Shorten Time PlayUp, Inc.'s and Daniel Simic's Motion for Protective Order and for Sanctions with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Request for Shortened time re #312 Motion for Protective Order,,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendants PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic. Responses due by 3/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - Joint Stipulation to Continue the Limited Deposition of Jeremy Kleiman, #3 Exhibit 2 - February 24, 2023 Email from Amanda J. Brookhyser, #4 Exhibit 3 - February 27, 2023 Email from Jennifer Braster Esq., #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Deposition of Dennis Drazin, #6 Exhibit 5 - February 13, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq., #7 Exhibit 6 - Subpoena Deces Tecum to Dennis Drazin, #8 Exhibit 7 - July 29, 2022 Withdrawal Letter from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Deposition of Daniel Simic, #10 Exhibit 9 - February 22, 2023 Email from Michael Popok, Esq., #11 Exhibit 10 - January 19, 2023 Letter from Michael Popok, Esq., #12 Exhibit 11 - January 30, 2023 Letter from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #13 Exhibit 12 - February 14, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq., #14 Exhibit 13 - February 26-27, 2023 Email from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #15 Exhibit 14 - February 14, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq.)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (nondispositive)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION for Sanctions PlayUp, Inc.'s and Daniel Simic's Motion for Protective Order and for Sanctions with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Request for Order Shortening Time by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendants PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic. (discovery) Responses due by 3/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - Joint Stipulation to Continue the Limited Deposition of Jeremy Kleiman, #3 Exhibit 2 - February 24, 2023 Email from Amanda J. Brookhyser, #4 Exhibit 3 - February 27, 2023 Email from Jennifer Braster Esq., #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Deposition of Dennis Drazin, #6 Exhibit 5 - February 13, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq., #7 Exhibit 6 - Subpoena Deces Tecum to Dennis Drazin, #8 Exhibit 7 - July 29, 2022 Withdrawal Letter from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Deposition of Daniel Simic, #10 Exhibit 9 - February 22, 2023 Email from Michael Popok, Esq., #11 Exhibit 10 - January 19, 2023 Letter from Michael Popok, Esq., #12 Exhibit 11 - January 30, 2023 Letter from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #13 Exhibit 12 - February 14, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq., #14 Exhibit 13 - February 26-27, 2023 Email from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #15 Exhibit 14 - February 14, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq.)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION for Protective Order by Counter Defendants PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic, Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 3/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - Joint Stipulation to Continue the Limited Deposition of Jeremy Kleiman, #3 Exhibit 2 - February 24, 2023 Email from Amanda J. Brookhyser, #4 Exhibit 3 - February 27, 2023 Email from Jennifer Braster Esq., #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Deposition of Dennis Drazin, #6 Exhibit 5 - February 13, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq., #7 Exhibit 6 - Subpoena Deces Tecum to Dennis Drazin, #8 Exhibit 7 - July 29, 2022 Withdrawal Letter from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Deposition of Daniel Simic, #10 Exhibit 9 - February 22, 2023 Email from Michael Popok, Esq., #11 Exhibit 10 - January 19, 2023 Letter from Michael Popok, Esq., #12 Exhibit 11 - January 30, 2023 Letter from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #13 Exhibit 12 - February 14, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq., #14 Exhibit 13 - February 26-27, 2023 Email from Jennifer Braster, Esq., #15 Exhibit 14 - February 14, 2023 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq.)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 First MOTION to Take Deposition from Dr. Laila Mintas Counter-Defendant Daniel Simic's Motion for Leave to Take a Second Deposition of Defendant/Counter-Claimant Dr. Laila-Mintas with Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. Responses due by 3/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - June 23, 2022 Transcript from the Deposition of Laila Mintas, #3 Exhibit 2 - November 2022 Email Exchange between Amanda Brookhyser, Esq. and Jennifer Braster, Esq.)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Granting #303 Motion to Extend Time to respond to counterclaim. PlayUp Ltd. answer due 3/17/2023; PlayUp, Inc. answer due 3/17/2023; Daniel Simic answer due 3/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 REPLY to Response to #303 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 RESPONSE to #303 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit 1)(Braster, Jennifer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/21/2023. Pending before the Court is a motion to shorten time. Docket No. 304; see also Docket No. 306 (corrected image). The motion to shorten time is GRANTED. Any response to the motion to extend must be filed by February 22, 2023, and any reply must be filed by February 23, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #304 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 -February 16, 2023 Email Correspondence between Amanda Brookhyser and Jennifer Braster)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #303 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 -February 16, 2023 Email Correspondence between Amanda Brookhyser and Jennifer Braster)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 First MOTION to Shorten Time Daniel Simic's Motion for Enlargement of Time and Request for Shortened Time re #303 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. Responses due by 3/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - March 21, 2022 Email Correspondence between Meredeth Markwell and Michael Popok)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (nondispositive)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Daniel Simic's Motion for Enlargement of Time and Request for Shortened Time re #133 Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. Responses due by 3/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - March 21, 2022 Email Correspondence between Meredeth Markwell and Michael Popok)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (answer)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER Denying #239 Motion for an award of Expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Granting #143 Motion to Dismiss. ORDER Denying #144 Motion to Dismiss. ORDER Granting #196 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REPLY to Response to #291 Motion for Protective Order,, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - Media Article PlayEngine has Announced Dr. Laila Mintas as Co-Founder and CEO, #3 Exhibit 2 - Nondisclosure Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - June 8, 2022 Correspondence Letter to Counsel Re Confidentiality Obligations)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 RESPONSE to #291 Motion for Protective Order,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Braster, Jennifer)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER Granting #294 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due by 5/15/2023. Motions due by 6/15/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 297 RESPONSE to #294 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Braster, Jennifer)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 296 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Yohania T. Santana is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration for CM/ (no image attached) (WJ)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2023. Pending before the Court is a motion to extend. Docket No. 294. The Court hereby SETS a deadline of January 30, 2023, for either Counter-Plaintiff to file a response in opposition or the parties to file a stipulation. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Non-Resident Counter-Defendant's PlayUp, Ltd's and Daniel Simic's Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines in the Scheduling Order Pursuant to Local Rules IA 6-1 and 26-3 re #237 Order by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. Responses due by 2/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael S. Popok, #2 Exhibit 1 - January 24-25, 2023 Email Thread, #3 Exhibit 2 - January 25, 2023 Email Thread)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (discovery)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Granting #286 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Yahania T. Santana and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Amanda J. Brookhyer. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #286 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Yohania T. Santana, by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic, Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Brookhyser, Amanda)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 2/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael S. Popok, #2 Exhibit 1 - January 5, 2023, Email Thread, #3 Exhibit 2 - January, 3-5 Email Thread, #4 Declaration Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #5 Exhibit A - Confidential Documents Submitted for in camera Review, #6 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ashley Kerr, #7 Exhibit C - September 30, 2022 Correspondence From Counsel for Laila Mintas, #8 Exhibit D - June 13, 2022 Correspondence From Counsel for FTX, #9 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Deposition of Laila Mintas)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Denying without prejudice #246 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Denying #238 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and #257 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE Notice of Unavailability by PlayUp Ltd., PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/11/2023. Pending before the Court is the #286 Motion/Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Yohania T. Santana ("Petitioner"). "Applications [to practice Pro Hac Vice] must be by verified petition on the form furnished by the clerk." D. Nev. Local Rule IA 11-2(a). Petitioner's Motion is not on the proper form furnished by the clerk. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #286 Motion/Verified Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until February 11, 2023, to file a corrected Verified Petition on the proper form using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Petitioner is advised that the form can be found on the Court's website under Attorney Admissions, Admission to Practice in a Particular Case. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and Petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Yohania T. Santana and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Amanda J. Brookhyser (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7169985) by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic, Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting #284 Joint Stipulation to Extend deadline to re-file motion for protective order. Motions due by 1/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Joint STIPULATION To Extend Deadline to Re-File Motion for Protective Order re #276 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda) (other) (nondispositive)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 REPLY to Response to #246 Motion for Sanctions,, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - November 13, 2021 Email from Michael Costa to Laila Mintas, #3 Exhibit 2 - November 15, 2021 Email from Richard Sapsford to Laila Mintas, #4 Exhibit 3 - Screenshots of Group Chat Labeled [Laila Sports Betting], #5 Exhibit 4 - September 13, 2022, letter from Patrick Boardman to Byrony Adams, Esq., #6 Exhibit 5 - PU Ltd Consitution, #7 Exhibit 6 - October 7, 2022 letter from Jennifer Braster, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Transcript of Deposition of Laila Mintas taken on June 23 & June 24, 2022, #9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Transcript Deposition of Jeremy Klieman taken on September 21, 2022, #10 Exhibit 9 - Minutes from the November 24, 2021 meeting of the Board of Directors of PlayUp, Ltd., #11 Exhibit 10 - PlayUp gets $35M Investment from FTX to Spur Growth in US Gaming Market, Steve Bittenbender, Casino.org, January 21, 2022, #12 Declaration Michael S. Popok - Addressing Mintas Declaration, #13 Exhibit A - Michael Popok Text Message Sent to Marc Brody, #14 Exhibit B - Text Message between Laila Mintas and Jeremy Klieman, #15 Exhibit C - September 27, 2022 Email to Jennifer Braster, #16 Declaration Michael S. Popok Addressing Braster Declaration, #17 Declaration Daniel Simic)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 REPLY to Response to #257 Motion for Sanctions, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - November 13, 2021 Email from Michael Costa to Laila Mintas, #3 Exhibit 2 - November 15, 2021 Email from Richard Sapsford to Laila Mintas, #4 Exhibit 3 - Screenshots of Group Chat Labeled [Laila Sports Betting], #5 Exhibit 4 - September 13, 2022, letter from Patrick Boardman to Byrony Adams, Esq., #6 Exhibit 5 - PU Ltd Consitution, #7 Exhibit 6 - October 7, 2022 letter from Jennifer Braster, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Transcript of Deposition of Laila Mintas taken on June 23 & June 24, 2022, #9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Transcript Deposition of Jeremy Klieman taken on September 21, 2022, #10 Exhibit 9 - Minutes from the November 24, 2021 meeting of the Board of Directors of PlayUp, Ltd., #11 Exhibit 10 - PlayUp gets $35M Investment from FTX to Spur Growth in US Gaming Market, Steve Bittenbender, Casino.org, January 21, 2022, #12 Declaration Michael S. Popok - Addressing Mintas Declaration, #13 Exhibit A - Michael Popok Text Message Sent to Marc Brody, #14 Exhibit B - Text Message between Laila Mintas and Jeremy Klieman, #15 Exhibit C - September 27, 2022 Email to Jennifer Braster, #16 Declaration Michael S. Popok Adressin Braster Declaration, #17 Declaration Daniel Simic)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order Dated December 8, 2022 by Laila Mintas re #276 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,.. (Gordon, Benjamin)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order Dated December 8, 2022 by Laila Mintas re #276 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,.. (Markwell, Meredith)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order Dated December 8, 2022 by Laila Mintas re #276 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,.. (Braster, Jennifer)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE Notice of Compliance of Amanda J. Brookhyser by PlayUp, Inc. re #276 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE Notice of Compliance of Michael S. Popok by PlayUp, Inc. re #276 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Denying without prejudice #218 Motion to Compel. ORDER Denying without prejudice #234 Motion for Protective Order. ORDER Denying without prejudice #275 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION to Compel Completion of Deposition of Jeremy Kleiman by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 12/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of J. Braster, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 2)(Braster, Jennifer) (discovery)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 RESPONSE to #257 Motion for Sanctions, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 12/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of L. Mintas, #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of J. Braster, #7 Exhibit 2-A, #8 Exhibit 2-B, #9 Exhibit 2-C, #10 Exhibit 2-D, #11 Exhibit 2-E, #12 Exhibit 2-F, #13 Exhibit 2-G, #14 Exhibit 2-H, #15 Exhibit 2-I, #16 Exhibit 2-J, #17 Exhibit 2-K, #18 Exhibit 2-L, #19 Exhibit 2-M, #20 Exhibit 2-N, #21 Exhibit 2-O, #22 Exhibit 2-P, #23 Exhibit 2-Q, #24 Exhibit 2-R, #25 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of J. Boardman)(Braster, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 RESPONSE to #246 Motion for Sanctions,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 12/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of L. Mintas, #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of J. Braster, #7 Exhibit 2-A, #8 Exhibit 2-B, #9 Exhibit 2-C, #10 Exhibit 2-D, #11 Exhibit 2-E, #12 Exhibit 2-F, #13 Exhibit 2-G, #14 Exhibit 2-H, #15 Exhibit 2-I, #16 Exhibit 2-J, #17 Exhibit 2-K, #18 Exhibit 2-L, #19 Exhibit 2-M, #20 Exhibit 2-N, #21 Exhibit 2-O, #22 Exhibit 2-P, #23 Exhibit 2-Q, #24 Exhibit 2-R)(Braster, Jennifer)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 REPLY to Response to #238 Motion to Disqualify Counsel,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B)(Braster, Jennifer)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 REPLY to Response to #239 Motion for Sanctions by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Excerpts)(Braster, Jennifer)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Denying as Moot #262 Motion to Extend Time. ORDER Granting #269 Stipulation to amend briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Joint STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order to Amend Briefing Schedule by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda) (other) (nondispositive)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER Granting #265 Motion to Extend Time to respond to #257 Motion for Sanctions. Responses due by 12/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Granting #264 Motion to Extend Time to reply to #239 Motion for Sanctions. Replies due by 12/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2022. Pending before the Court is Defendant's motion to extend time for a reply brief. Docket No. 263. It appears the only dispute between the parties is the length of the extension to be provided. See Docket No. 263-4 at 1. This is not the type of issue that should require motion practice. The pending motion is DENIED without prejudice. Counsel must continue to confer in the spirit of cooperation to attempt to find an acceptable compromise. Any renewed request must be filed by noon on November 18, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #257 Motion for Sanctions, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 11/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Gordon, #3 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #4 Exhibit 1)(Braster, Jennifer) (nondispositive)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #239 Motion for Sanctions by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 11/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Gordon, #3 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #4 Exhibit 1)(Braster, Jennifer) (nondispositive)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #238 Motion to Disqualify Counsel,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 11/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Gordon, #3 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #4 Exhibit 1)(Braster, Jennifer) (nondispositive)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #246 Motion for Sanctions,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 11/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Gordon, #3 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Braster, Jennifer) (nondispositive)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REPLY to Response to #234 Motion for Protective Order,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - May 12, 2022 Correspondence Letter from Benjamin Gordon to Amanda Brookhyser, #3 Exhibit 2 - May 20, 2022 Email Correspondence to Jennifer Braster from Amanda Brookhyser, #4 Exhibit 3 - Media Article, PlayEngine has Announce Dr. Laila Mintas as Co-Founder and CEO, #5 Exhibit 4 - Nondisclosure Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 - June 8, 2022 Correspondence Letter to Counsel Re Confidentiality Designations)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 DECLARATION of Michael Gerrard re #257 Motion for Sanctions, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc... (Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 DECLARATION of Amanda J. Brookyser re #257 Motion for Sanctions, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Composite Chart, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Mintas' Deposition Transcripts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Jeremey Kleiman Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from Jamie Blankenship Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Chris Cheung Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 - Media Articles, #7 Exhibit 7 - Media Article Re Lawsuit and TRO Filings, #8 Exhibit 8 - Media Article, Gaspar Ineze, PlayEngine has Announced Dr. Laila Mintas as Co-Founder and CEO, Gaming Americas, November 7, 2022)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 DECLARATION re #257 Motion for Sanctions, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Filed in Singleton Mintas Case, #2 Exhibit B - Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed in Singleton Mintas Case, #3 Exhibit C - Temporary Restraining Order from Singleton Mintas Case, #4 Exhibit D - Preliminary Injunction from Singleton Mintas Case, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavits from Laila Mintas Australian Case, #6 Exhibit F - Email Correspondence from Michael Popok to Devon Jackson, #7 Exhibit G - PlayUp, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Counter MOTION for Sanctions PlayUp, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Disqualify PlayUp's Counsel and For Sanctions and Countermotion for Sanctions with Incorporated Memorandum of Law [Oral Argument Requested] by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (discovery) Responses due by 11/29/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #255 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ERRATA to #251 Exhibit, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Email Correspondence from Micahel Popok to Devon Jackson)(Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified on 11/15/2022 link to 238 (WJ).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #248 Response. Attorney Amanda Brookhyser advised to review and comply with LR IC 2-2(b) and file your counter motion for sanctions as a separate motion. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 11/16/2022 COMPLIED (WJ).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #251 , #250 , #249 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to correctly selected the proper event in all future filings. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #251 , #250 , #249 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 EXHIBIT Declaration of Michael Popok to #248 Response, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified on 11/15/2022 linked to #238 (WJ).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 EXHIBIT Declaration of Michael Garrard to #248 Response, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified on 11/15/2022 linked #238 (WJ).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 EXHIBIT Declaration of Amanda Brookhyser to #248 Response, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified on 11/15/2022 linked to #238 (WJ).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 RESPONSE to #238 Motion to Disqualify Counsel,, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda Broookhyser, #2 Declaration Michael Popok, #3 Declaration Michael Garrard)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 RESPONSE to #239 Motion for Sanctions by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. Replies due by 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Daniel Simic's Objections to Defendant-Counterclaimant Laila Mintas' First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit B - Daniel Simic's Objections to Defendant-Counterclaimant Laila Mintas' Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit C - PlayUp, Ltd's Objections to Defendant-Counterclaimant Laila Mintas' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION for Sanctions PlayUp, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rules 11 of The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and The Court's Inherent Authority, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law [Oral Argument Requested] by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (discovery) Responses due by 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Sam Bankman-Fried Email Communication, #3 Exhibit B - David Ma WhatsApp Communications, #4 Exhibit C - Mintas Depostion Vol. 1 & 2 Highlighted, #5 Exhibit D - Letter from Jennifer Braster, #6 Exhibit E - Email from Michael Popok)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Granting #244 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #238 Motion to Disqualify Counsel,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (nondispositive)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 REPLY to Response to #231 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer Braster, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B)(Braster, Jennifer)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of In Camera Inspection of Documents by Laila Mintas re #241 Response,.. (Braster, Jennifer) Modified on 11/10/2022 linked to #234 (WJ).
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 RESPONSE to #234 Motion for Protective Order,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Braster Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - to be submitted in camera, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Braster, Jennifer)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 RESPONSE to #231 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 11/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A- November 2, 2022, Email)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION for Sanctions re #220 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,,,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. (discovery) Responses due by 11/14/2022. (Braster, Jennifer)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of B. Gordon, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of J. Braster, #4 Exhibit 2-A, #5 Exhibit 2-B, #6 Exhibit 2-C, #7 Exhibit 2-D, #8 Exhibit 2-E, #9 Exhibit 2-F, #10 Exhibit 2-G, #11 Exhibit 2-H, #12 Exhibit 2-I, #13 Exhibit 2-J, #14 Exhibit 2-K, #15 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of L. Mintas)(Braster, Jennifer)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER re Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/3/2023. Motions due by 5/3/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of In Camera Submission Pursuant to LR IA 10-4 by PlayUp, Inc... (Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 RESPONSE to #232 Order on Motion,,,,, by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Confidential Documents Submitted In Camera for Review, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ashley Kerr, #4 Exhibit C - September 30, 2022 Correspondence from Counsel for Laila Mintas, #5 Exhibit D - June 13, 2022 Correspondence from Counsel for FTX, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Deposition of Laila Mintas)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 RESPONSE to #232 Order on Motion,,,,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to File Document re #182 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 by Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 11/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of PlayUp Inc.'s 30(b)(6) deposition transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated October 7, 2022)(Braster, Jennifer) (presiding)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Denying #221 Emergency Motion for Stay. The Court has already modified the scheduling order by extending the dispositive motion deadline. Docket No. 228. To the extent the parties believe additional modification of the scheduling order is warranted in light of the ruling made herein, they must file a request for such relief by October 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) Order signed by Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2022 - Modified on 10/19/2022 (TRW).
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 RESPONSE to #222 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B)(Braster, Jennifer)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REPLY to Response to #218 Motion to Compel, by Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K)(Gordon, Benjamin)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER *re #221 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that the deadline for Counter-Defendants to provide the identified discovery is EXTENDED to November 28, 2022, and the dispositive motion deadline is EXTENDED to January 31, 2023. All other deadlines in the scheduling order remain unchanged. The deadline to file a joint statement on potential modification of the scheduling order (currently set for October 13, 2022) is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) Modified on 10/14/2022 (AC).
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 REPLY to Response to #221 Motion,, by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 RESPONSE to #218 Motion to Compel, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 10/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Magdalena Rudzka, Esq., #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Laila Mintas Deposition)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESPONSE to #221 Motion,, by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 10/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Braster, Jennifer)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER. Pending before the Court is a motion to stay the undersigned's order denying a motion to stay discovery and granting a motion to compel discovery. Docket No. 221. Any response to that motion must be filed by October 6, 2022, and any reply must be filed by October 7, 2022. In the interim, the Court EXTENDS the deadline to file a joint statement regarding any potential modification of the scheduling order to October 13, 2022, and also EXTENDS the deadline for Counter-Defendants to provide discovery to October 20, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE of Unavailability by PlayUp Ltd., PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic re #220 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,,,,.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 First OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 re #220 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,,,, by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic.. Responses due by 10/18/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion for Stay, or In the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Complete Ordered Discovery With Incorporated Memorandum of Law (First Request) re #220 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,,,, by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. Responses due by 10/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A- Email to Jennifer Braster, #3 Exhibit B - Read Receipt)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (misc) (discovery)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER Granting #203 Motion to Compel. ORDER Denying #213 Motion to Stay Case. Counter-Defendants must respond to the identified discovery9 by October 13, 2022. Given the procedural posture of the case and the ruling made herein, it is not clear whether the scheduling order needs to be modified. The parties must promptly confer and must file a joint statement on that issue by October 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 REPLY to Response to #213 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Counsel Emails)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Compel by Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 10/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Benjamin Gordon Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Gordon, Benjamin) (discovery)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 RESPONSE to #216 Order, by Defendant Laila Mintas. (Markwell, Meredith)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER. The Court orders Counter-Plaintiff to file a response to #213 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by September 20, 2022, and Counter-Defendants to file a reply by September 27, 2022. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 REPLY to Response to #203 Motion to Compel, by Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #2 Exhibit 1-A)(Markwell, Meredith)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/2022. Counter-Defendants filed both a response to a motion to compel and a cross-motion to stay discovery. Docket Nos. 212, 213. The Court does not require separate briefing on the cross-motion to stay discovery, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(B), so none will be allowed. Instead, the only remaining brief on this motion practice is the reply to the motion to compel. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Cross MOTION to Stay Discovery by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. Responses due by 9/20/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 RESPONSE to #203 Motion to Compel, by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., Daniel Simic. Replies due by 9/13/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Denying without prejudice #180 Motion for Sanctions. ORDER Denying without prejudice #181 Motion to Extend Time. ORDER Denying as moot #202 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #197 Motion for Protective Order. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/2/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE to #202 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 9/7/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Filed in error. Please see #209 for correct filing. RESPONSE to #196 Motion, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc. Replies due by 9/7/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 REPLY to Response to #197 Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 REPLY to Response to #196 Motion, by Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D)(Markwell, Meredith)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 RESPONSE to #197 Motion for Protective Order, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN B. GORDON IN SUPPORT OF DR. LAILA MINTAS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAYUP, INC.S RENEWED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Jennifer Braster 7-15-22 Email, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - PlayUp, Inc. Seventh Supplemental Initial Disclosure, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Chris Cheung Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit Chris Cheung Deposition, Exhibit 1)(Gordon, Benjamin)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESPONSE to #196 Motion, by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. Replies due by 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Laila Mintas Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Chris Cheung Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Jamie Blankenship Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit D - Laila Mintas's Tenth Supplemental Disclosure Served on July 6, 2022, #6 Exhibit E - Laila Mintas' First Supplemental Disclosure Served on March 30, 2022, #7 Exhibit F - Emails between Amanda Brookhyser, Esq. and Jennifer Braster, Esq.)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION to Compel Daniel Simic and PlayUp LTD to Respond to Discovery Requests by Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 9/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit 1-G, #9 Exhibit 1-H, #10 Exhibit 1-I, #11 Exhibit 1-J)(Markwell, Meredith) (discovery)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION for Leave to File Document re #187 Response to #180 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith Markwell, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Declaration of Dr. Laila Mintas, #4 Exhibit 2-A, #5 Exhibit 2-B, #6 Exhibit 2-C)(Markwell, Meredith) (discovery) Modified to link to underlying motion on 8/18/2022 (EDS).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER on Mandate as to #185 USCA Memorandum/Opinion and #98 USCA Order AFFIRMING judgment of the US District Court re #39 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) Modified text on 8/16/2022 (EDS).
August 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 191 Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Court [Reporter] Transcriber: Amber McClane, AM@nvd.uscourts.gov. Recording start and end times: 10:20 a.m. - 10:45 a.m. Any Redaction Request is due by 9/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 9/14/2022. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/12/2022. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. The Transcript Order Form is available on the court website. After that date, the transcript may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (AMM)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Notice of PlayUp US 30(b)(6) Deposition)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION to Supplement #166 Response in Opposition to Counter-Defendant Daniel Simic's #144 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Counterclaim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,se by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster)(Braster, Jennifer) (misc) (dispositive) Modified on 8/11/2022 to relink document to underlying Motion (SLD).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REPLY to Response to #181 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REPLY to Response to #180 Motion for Sanctions,,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Mintas Depo Highlights 08.03.2022, #3 Exhibit B Sam Bankman-Fried Email Communication - Redacted, #4 Exhibit C David Ma WhatsApp Communication - Redacted)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Granting #192 Stipulation to Extend Limited Fact Witness Discovery. Discovery due by 9/22/2022. Motions due by 10/31/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) Joint Stipulation and Order to Extend Limited Fact Witness Discovery Pursuant to Local Rule IA 6-1 and Local Rule 26-3 (Third Request) re #158 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda) (extend) (discovery)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing re #189 Motion for Protective Order held on 8/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Crtrm Administrator: A. Caytuero; Pla Counsel: Michael Popok, Esq., & Amanda Brookhyser, Esq.; Def Counsel: Jennifer L. Braster, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 10:20 AM - 10:45 AM; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/ CRD; Recording start and end times: 10:20:38 - 10:45:15; Courtroom: 3C; Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel are present via telephonic appearance. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears the representations of counsel as to #189 Motion for Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that #189 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in part, as stated on the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that both Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel must meet and confer immediately regarding new deposition dates, as outlined in open court. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2022. Pending before the Court is an emergency motion for protective order. Docket No. 189. The Court does not need argument on the deposition topics, and that aspect of the motion is DENIED as untimely. See, e.g., Nationstar Mtg., LLC v. Flamingo Trails No. 7 Landscape Maintenance Assoc., 316 F.R.D. 327, 336 (D. Nev. 2016); Cardoza v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc., 141 F. Supp. 3d 1137, 1140-41 (D. Nev. 2015); Caraway v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC, 269 F.R.D. 627, 628 (E.D. Tex. 2010). With respect to the timing issue, however, the Court SETS a telephonic hearing for 10:15 a.m. this morning, August 2, 2022. Counsel must appear telephonically by calling the Court conference line at 877-402-9757 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The conference code is 6791056. In order to ensure a clear recording of the hearing, the call must be made using a land line phone. Cell phone calls, as well as the use of a speaker phone, are prohibited. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE to #181 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 8/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F)(Gordon, Benjamin)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RESPONSE to #180 Motion for Sanctions,,,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 8/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 2-A, #8 Exhibit 2-B, #9 Exhibit 2-C, #10 Exhibit 2-D, #11 Exhibit 2-E, #12 Exhibit 2-F, #13 Exhibit 2-G, #14 Exhibit 2-H, #15 Exhibit 2-I, #16 Exhibit 2-J, #17 Exhibit 2-K)(Markwell, Meredith)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 RESPONSE to #182 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM of USCA, Ninth Circuit, AFFIRMING the district court's denial of the motion for preliminary injunction, re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by PlayUp, Inc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Denying #183 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Shorten Time PlayUp, Inc.'s Motion for an Order Shortening Time re #181 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (discovery)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 re #178 Order on Motion to Compel by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas.. Responses due by 7/28/2022. (Braster, Jennifer)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) PlayUp, Inc.'s Motion to for Extenstion of Discovery Deadlines (Third Request) re #158 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - July 7, 2022 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq. to Jennifer Braster, Esq., #3 Exhibit B - July 11, 2022 Email from Jennifer Braster, Esq. to Amanda Brookhyser, Esq.)(Brookhyser, Amanda) (discovery)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 First MOTION for Sanctions PlayUp, Inc.'s Motion for Discovery Sanctions with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc., Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (discovery) Responses due by 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit A - Transcript of Laila Mintas Deposition, #3 Exhibit B - June 6, 2022 Email from Laila Mintas' Counsel, #4 Exhibit C - Mintas' Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, #5 Exhibit D - July 11, 2022 Email from Mintas' Counsel, #6 Exhibit E - PlayUp US First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit F - Stipulation and Order Scheduling the Videotaped Deposition of Laila Mintas and Feri Mintas, #8 Exhibit G - June 2, 2022 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq. to Jennifer Braster, Esq., #9 Exhibit H - June 7, 2022 Deficiency Letter, #10 Exhibit I - July 1, 2022 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq. to Benjamin Gordon, Esq., #11 Exhibit J - July 5, 2022 Email from Benjamin Gordon, Esq. to Amanda Brookhyser, Esq., #12 Exhibit K - July 7, 2022 Email from Amanda Brookhyser, Esq. to Jennifer Braster, Esq.)(Brookhyser, Amanda)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Granting #156 Motion to Seal 154 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Denying 154 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPLY to Response to #154 Motion to Compel by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster) (Braster, Jennifer)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Granting #175 Stipulation to Extend Time to file reply to #154 Motion to Compel. Replies due by 6/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery re #154 Motion to Compel by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPLY to Response to #143 Motion to Dismiss,,, by Counter Defendant PlayUp Ltd.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 REPLY to Response to #147 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - Laila Mintas' March 1, 2022, Affidavit filed in the Australian Action, #3 Exhibit 2 - Laila Mintas' April 28, 2022, Affidavit Filed in the Australian Action) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY to Response to #144 Motion to Dismiss,, by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RESPONSE to #154 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 6/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - PlayUp. Inc.'s Amended Responses and Objections to Defendant/Counter-Claimant Laila Mintas' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 - May 5, 2022, Letter to Counsel Re Meet and Confer, #4 Exhibit 3 - June 6, 2022, Email Providing Custodian Information, #5 Exhibit 4 - June 10, 2022, Email Providing the Non-Redacted Citations) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 RESPONSE to #156 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Non-Response by Laila Mintas re #156 Motion to Seal. (Gordon, Benjamin)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE to #143 Motion to Dismiss,,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 6/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Dr. Laila Mintas) (Braster, Jennifer)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE to #148 Motion to Strike, #147 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 6/21/2022. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE to #144 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 6/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Braster, Jennifer)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster) (Gordon, Benjamin)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RESPONSE to #146 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 6/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster) (Gordon, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Denying without prejudice #161 Motion to Compel. ORDER Denying without prejudice #162 Motion to Extend Time. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to email and mail a copy of this order to: Henry Thomas Counsel, Sportradar 7251 W. Lake Mead Blvd., Suite 500 Las Vegas, Nevada 89128 h.thomas@sportradar.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Copy Mailed to Henry Thomas - LOE)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Shorten Time PlayUp, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Third-Party Sportradar's Compliance With Court Order (Dkt. 139) With Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Request for Shortened Time re #139 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, Order on Motion to Quash,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1-Order, #3 Exhibit 2 May 20, 2022 Email, #4 Exhibit 3 May 24, 2022 Email, #5 Exhibit 4 June 2, 2022 Chain Email, #6 Exhibit 5 June 9, 2022 Chain Email) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 First MOTION to Compel PlayUp, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Third-Party Sportradar's Compliance With Court Order (Dkt. 139) With Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #139 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, Order on Motion to Quash,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 6/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1-Order, #3 Exhibit 2 May 20, 2022 Email, #4 Exhibit 3 May 24, 2022 Email, #5 Exhibit 4 June 2, 2022 Chain Email, #6 Exhibit 5 June 9, 2022 Chain Email) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/8/2022. In light of the #130 Order Granting Defendant Laila Mintas's ("Defendant's") #78 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Counterclaim and her subsequent filing of the #133 Second Counterclaim, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Daniel Simic's #67 First Motion to Dismiss the Amended Counterclaim and PlayUp, Inc.'s #68 First Motion to Dismiss the Amended Counterclaim are DENIED as moot. See Ramirez v. County of San Bernardino, 806 F.3d 1002, 1008 (9th Cir. 2015). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying without prejudice #124 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Stipulation; Discovery due by 8/22/2022. Motions due by 9/27/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery Joint Stipulation and Order to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines By An Additional 21 Days Pursuant to Local Rule IA 6-1 and Local Rule 26-3 re #99 Order on Stipulation,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to Seal #154 Motion to Compel by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION to Compel by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1 of 2, #2 Appendix Part 2 of 2) (Braster, Jennifer)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #152 Notice of Corrected Image. The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #152 using the appropriate docket entry event, Motion to Dismiss. If counsel is attempting to file a Motion to Stay, the document needs to be corrected as it currently is a Motion to Dismiss. (no image attached) (EDS)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #145 Motion to Stay Case, by Counter Defendant PlayUp Ltd.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Declaration Ashley Maurice Kerr, #3 Exhibit A - Originating Application, #4 Exhibit B- Statement of Claim, #5 Exhibit C - Order Granting Injunctive Relief) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #145 Motion to Stay. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #145 using the appropriate docket entry event. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting #142 Stipulation to Extend time to file Motion to Dismiss. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/31/2022, nunc pro tunc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY to Response to #124 Motion to Quash,,, by Movant Dennis Drazin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1- Email Chain Re: Motion to Quash) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 First MOTION to Strike #133 Counterclaim by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 6/14/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 First MOTION to Dismiss #133 Counterclaim by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 6/14/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 First MOTION to Stay Case re #133 Counterclaim by Counter Defendant PlayUp Ltd.. Responses due by 6/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Declaration Ashley Maurice Kerr, #3 Exhibit A - Originating Application, #4 Exhibit B- Statement of Claim, #5 Exhibit C - Order Granting Injunctive Relief) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 First MOTION to Dismiss #133 Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Daniel Simic. Responses due by 6/14/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Daniel Simic) (Brookhyser, Amanda) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 First MOTION to Dismiss #133 Counterclaim by Counter Defendant PlayUp Ltd.. Responses due by 6/14/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Declaration Ashley Maurice Kerr, #3 Exhibit A - Originating Application, #4 Exhibit B- Statement of Claim, #5 Exhibit C - Order Granting Injunctive Relief) (Brookhyser, Amanda) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for PlayUp, Inc, Daniel Simic and PlayUp, LTD to File Motions to Dismiss Addressed to Laila Mintas' Second Amended Counterclaim re #133 Counterclaim by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic, Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ANSWER to #134 Amended Complaint filed by Laila Mintas.(Braster, Jennifer)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE to #124 Motion to Quash,,, #125 Motion for Protective Order,,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 5/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster) (Braster, Jennifer)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. ORDER Denying #83 Motion for Protective Order. ORDER Denying #84 Motion to Quash. ORDER Granting #115 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence. For the reasons discussed in this order, the motions to quash and for protective order are DENIED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. Except for the visa documents discussed in Section III.A., Sportradar must comply with the subpoena by 06/03/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Denying #137 Stipulation regarding the depositions of Defendant and Feridun Mintas. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION re Discovery Stipulation and Order Scheduling the Videotaped Depositions of Laila Mintas and Feri Mintas by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 WITHDRAWAL of #117 Motion to Strike, #116 Motion to Seal, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Laila Mintas by PlayUp, Inc.. No changes to parties. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Second COUNTERCLAIM against PlayUp Ltd., PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic by Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting #79 Motion to Amend/Correct re #1 Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly file and serve the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Denying without Prejudice #128 Motion for Protective Order. ORDER Denying without Prejudice #129 Motion to Shorten Time. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting #78 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim re #52 Answer to Counterclaim. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant must promptly file and serve the amended counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION to Shorten Time re #128 Motion for Protective Order by Deponent Feridun Mintas, Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Feri Mintas) (Braster, Jennifer)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Protective Order by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas, Deponent Feridun Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Feri Mintas) (Braster, Jennifer)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE to #117 Motion to Strike, #116 Motion to Seal, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster) (Braster, Jennifer)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NON-OPPOSITION to #115 Motion,, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION for Protective Order by Movant Dennis Drazin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum to Dennis Drazin, #3 Exhibit 2 PlayUp, Inc. Responses and Objections to Defendant /Counterclaimant Laila Mintas' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 3 Defendant and Counterclaimant Dr. Laila Mintas' Requests for Production of Documents to Daniel Simic, #5 Exhibit 4 Defendant and Counterclaimant Dr. Laila Mintas' Interrogatories to Daniel Simic (First Request), #6 Exhibit 5 Defendant and Counterclaimant Dr. Laila Mintas' Requests for Production of Documents to PlayUp, LTD., #7 Exhibit 6 April 8, 2022 Email Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 7 Comparative Chart) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Quash Non-Party Dennis Drazin's Motion to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents or in the Alternative for a Protective Order (Oral Argument Requested) by Movant Dennis Drazin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum to Dennis Drazin, #3 Exhibit 2 PlayUp, Inc. Responses and Objections to Defendant /Counterclaimant Laila Mintas' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 3 Defendant and Counterclaimant Dr. Laila Mintas' Requests for Production of Documents to Daniel Simic, #5 Exhibit 4 Defendant and Counterclaimant Dr. Laila Mintas' Interrogatories to Daniel Simic (First Request), #6 Exhibit 5 Defendant and Counterclaimant Dr. Laila Mintas' Requests for Production of Documents to PlayUp, LTD., #7 Exhibit 6 April 8, 2022 Email Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 7 Comparative Chart) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying without prejudice #118 Motion to Compel; ORDER denying without prejudice #119 Motion for Sanctions; ORDER denying as moot #122 Motion to Seal. The Clerk's Office to STRIKE the appendix at Docket No. 121 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION to Seal #120 Appendix by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 APPENDIX to #118 Motion to Compel, #119 Motion for Sanctions by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Sanctions by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 5/18/2022. (Braster, Jennifer)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION to Compel by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 5/18/2022. (Braster, Jennifer)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION to Strike by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael S. Popok, #2 Exhibit A Harman v. Security of State for the Home Department 1983 1 AC 280, #3 Exhibit B The Harman Undertaking by Rachelle Seiden SC Greg Antipas and Russ Johnson, #4 Exhibit C Hearne v. Street (2008) 235 CLR, #5 Exhibit D Letter from HSF to Dr. Mintas 27 April, 2022) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael S. Popok, #2 Exhibit A Harman v. Security of State for the Home Department 1983 1 AC 280, #3 Exhibit B The Harman Undertaking by Rachelle Seiden SC Greg Antipas and Russ Johnson, #4 Exhibit C Hearne v. Street (2008) 235 CLR, #5 Exhibit D Letter from HSF to Dr. Mintas 27 April, 2022) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Support of Plaintiff and Counterdefendant PlayUp, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant/Counterclaimant Mintas' Motion to Quash Subpoena to Sportradar US (Dkt. No. 109) With Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #109 Response, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Ben Gordon Email, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email to FTX from Mintas) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPLY to Response to #79 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda J. Brookhyser) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY to Response to #83 Motion for Protective Order, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Benjamin B. Gordon) (Braster, Jennifer)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY to Response to #78 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Laila Mintas, #2 Exhibit A) (Braster, Jennifer)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY to Response to #84 Motion to Quash, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Benjamin B. Gordon) (Braster, Jennifer)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting #108 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #79 Motion to Amend/Correct, #78 Motion for Leave to File Document. Replies due by 4/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE to #84 Motion to Quash, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mintas' Answering Brief Ninth Circuit, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mintas' LinkedIn Profile Page) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Date to File Reply re #79 Motion to Amend/Correct, #78 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE to #78 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Counter Defendants PlayUp Ltd., PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic, Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Replies due by 4/18/2022. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to #79 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DR. LAILA MINTAS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAYUP INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, #2 Declaration JENNIFER L. BRASTERS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAYUP INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit Consulting Agreement, #5 Exhibit Employment Agreement) (Gordon, Benjamin)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Stipulation. The Court VACATES the deadline to respond to the subpoena. Plaintiff must immediately notify Bally's of this order. If Plaintiff receives any documents in response to the subpoena while the subject motions are pending, Plaintiff may not review those documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order re #103 Order on Motion to Quash,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Denying #100 Motion to Quash, #101 Motion for Protective Order, and #102 Motion to Shorten Time. No later than noon on 4/11/2022, counsel must either (1) file a stipulation that the Ballys subpoena will be held in abeyance until the Court rules on the previously-filed motion practice with respect to the Sportradar US subpoena, or (2) renew the motion practice on the Ballys subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to Shorten Time re #101 Motion for Protective Order, #100 Motion to Quash, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Braster, Jennifer)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Protective Order by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Braster, Jennifer)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents to Ballys Corporation by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Braster, Jennifer)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting #97 Stipulation - Discovery due by 8/22/2022. Motions due by 9/27/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order to Extend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Deadlines by Sixty (60) Days Pursuant to Local Rule IA 6-1 and Local Rule 26-3 re #58 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified text on 4/7/2022 (EDS).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 First MOTION to Extend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Deadlines by Sixty (60) Days Pursuant to Local Rule IA 6-1 and Local Rule 26-3 re #58 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/6/2022. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.'s ("Plaintiff's") #66 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff seeks leave to file an additional ten (10) pages to its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Counterclaim. (See Mot. Leave 2:1-3, ECF No. #66 ). Defendant Dr. Lailas Mintas does not oppose. (Id. 3:6-7). Accordingly, for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #66 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/6/2022. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.'s ("Plaintiff's") Emergency Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule, (ECF No. #91 ). In #91 Motion, Plaintiff requests the Court temporarily suspend the briefing schedule relating to the #67 and #68 Motions to Dismiss in light of the parties' pending #78 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Counterclaim and #79 Motion to Amend. Defendant Dr. Laila Mintas ("Defendant") agrees to resetting the briefing schedule and granting the #78 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Counterclaim, but opposes this Court granting the #79 Motion to Amend. (See Resp. to Emergency Mot. 1:26-2:3). In light of the briefing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #91 Emergency Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines to file a reply to the #67 and #68 Motions to Dismiss are STAYED until ruling on the #78 and #79 Motions to Amend. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY to Response to #91 Motion, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE to #91 Motion, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit 1) (Braster, Jennifer)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION PlayUp, Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule re #75 Order on Stipulation,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser, #2 Exhibit Meet and Confer Email Correspondence) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Striking #82 Affidavit, #80 Affidavit, #86 Affidavit, and #81 Affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #87 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,, by PlayUp, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minute Order and Letter to Sportradar, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Return Receipt Requested) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #87 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,, by PlayUp, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minute Order, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Return Receipt Requested) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying #85 Motion to shorten time. Instead, the Court VACATES the deadline to respond to the subpoena. Plaintiff must immediately notify Sportradar US of this order.1 Given the vacation of the subject deadline, there is no need to shorten time and the underlying motions will be briefed and decided in the ordinary course. Accordingly, the motion to shorten time is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT of Acceptance of Service of Subpoena to Produce Adrianna Samuels re #58 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda) stricken on 4/1/2022 per #90 order.(LOE)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Shorten Time re #83 Motion for Protective Order, #84 Motion to Quash, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Braster, Jennifer)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents to Sportradar US by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Braster, Jennifer)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Protective Order by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Braster, Jennifer)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of Acceptance of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Feri Mintas re #58 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Subpoena to Produce The Nevada Gaming Control Board re #58 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Subpoena To Produce The Nevada Gaming Commission re #58 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim re #52 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Braster, Jennifer)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE to #67 Motion to Dismiss, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 4/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Laila Mintas, #2 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster) (Braster, Jennifer)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to #68 Motion to Dismiss by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 4/1/2022. (Braster, Jennifer)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 , #74 Stipulation Re: #67 , #68 Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/25/2022. Replies due by 4/8/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #68 Motion to Dismiss by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #67 Motion to Dismiss, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Braster, Jennifer)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Stipulation; PlayUp, Inc. answer/motion due 4/8/2022. Responses due by 4/22/2022. Replies due by 4/29/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for PlayUp LTD to File a Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Counterclaim re #52 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 WITHDRAWAL of #63 Motion, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Gordon, Benjamin)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by PlayUp Ltd. on 3/8/2022 executed by Laila Mintas re #52 Answer to Counterclaim,,,. AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION (ECF NO. 63) (Gordon, Benjamin)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 First MOTION to Dismiss #52 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 First MOTION to Dismiss #52 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendants PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic. Responses due by 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Daniel Simic, #2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Amanda Brookhyser) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendants PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Amanda J. Brookhyser) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/24/2022. Pending before the Court is a motion to shorten time, Docket No. 64, which is DENIED. The motion to effectuate service will be briefed and decided in the ordinary course. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Shorten Time re #63 Motion, by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration of Benjamin B. Gordon) (Braster, Jennifer)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Effectuate Service on PlayUp Ltd. by Mail Consistent with the Hague Convention by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Responses due by 3/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Braster, #2 Declaration Benjamin B. Gordon) (Braster, Jennifer)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined, with respect to any documents filed under seal as it relates to the previously entered protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting #60 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/17/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Gordon, Benjamin)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #57 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order - Discovery due by 6/27/2022. Motions due by 7/27/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/16/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 20 Minute Order, addressed to Laila Mintas. (KF)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PlayUp, Inc.. (DRS)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued PlayUp Ltd. by Counter Claimants Laila Mintas, Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Gordon, Benjamin)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Daniel Simic on 1/28/2022 executed by Laila Mintas re #34 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,. (Braster, Jennifer)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED Counterclaim ANSWER re #34 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, , COUNTERCLAIM against PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic, PlayUp Ltd. by Laila Mintas. filed by Laila Mintas.(Braster, Jennifer) Modified event on 1/31/2022 (EDS).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting in part and Denied in part #46 Motion to Extend Time PlayUp, Inc. and Daniel Simic answer due to Counterclaim on 3/7/2022 at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified text on 1/27/2022 (EDS).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY to Response to #46 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #42 Stipulation - Zumpano Patricios Popok and Helsten PLLC in for Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2022. Attorneys Jennifer K. Hostetler and Douglas B Tumminello terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2022. Pending before the Court is a motion to extend. Docket No. 46. A response has been filed. Docket No. 47. Any reply must be filed by noon on January 25, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE to #46 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Braster, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Braster, Jennifer)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) of Certain Deadlines re #34 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified text on 1/24/2022 (EDS).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael S Popok for PlayUp, Inc.,Michael S Popok for PlayUp, Inc.,Michael S Popok for Daniel Simic and approving Designation of Local Counsel Amanda J Brookhyser. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael S. Popok and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Amanda J. Brookhyser (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6765593) by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and Order of Substitution of Counsel by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc. (Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (EDS).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc. re #39 Notice of Appeal, #33 Transcript,,,. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #39 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 transcript order form) (EDS)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 32 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc., Counter Defendant PlayUp, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-6758237. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Simic re #1 Complaint. (KF)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Daniel Simic by Counter Claimant Laila Mintas, Defendant Laila Mintas. (Gordon, Benjamin)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laila Mintas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gordon, Benjamin)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/10/2022. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Defendant must file a certificate of interested parties no later than January 17, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/21/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against PlayUp, Inc., Daniel Simic by Laila Mintas. filed by Laila Mintas.(Braster, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 32 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing, held on 01/05/2022, before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Court Reporter: Paige Christian, Paige_Christian@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 1/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/7/2022. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/7/2022. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PMC) (Main Document 33 replaced on 1/7/2022) (PMC).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing re Plaintiff's #4 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 1/5/2022 before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: NEV; Pla Counsel: Douglas Tumminello, Esq., Jennifer Hostetler, Esq., and Dibora Berhani, Esq. with client representative Raymond Gonzalez; Def Counsel: Jennifer Braster, Esq. with defendant Dr. Mintas.; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Araceli Berish; Recording start and end times: 1:03 p.m. - 2:37 p.m.; Courtroom: 7D.The Court makes preliminary statements and hears arguments from counsel as to Plaintiff's #4 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #4 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #25 Motion to Extend Time (Second Request) to File Reply in Support of #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiff's #29 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence for Reply In Support of #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are GRANTED. No separate order will issue. Court adjourns. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to #29 Motion for Leave to File Document,,, by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 1/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Dr. Mintas, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Ms. Braster, #5 Exhibit 5) (Braster, Jennifer)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence for Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #28 Notice of Corrected Image/Document,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Simic, #2 Exhibit A - Oct 12 2021 D. Simic Email, #3 Exhibit B - Sept 24 2021 A. Dabir Email, #4 Exhibit C - July 13 2021 N. Arora Email, #5 Exhibit D - Dec 2021 F. Amirbeaggi Emails, #6 Exhibit E - Nov-Dec 2021 FTX Emails, #7 Exhibit F - Simic and Mintas Text Messagess, #8 Declaration of Farshad Amirbeaggi, #9 Exhibit A - Emergency Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #10 Exhibit B - Dec 7-15 2021 F. Amirbeaggi Emails, #11 Exhibit C - Dec 15 2021 F. Amirbeaggi Affidavit) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #27 Reply, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement (Second), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Dennis Drazin, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Daniel Simic, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Brooke Maniscalco, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email from F. Amirbeaggi to L. Mintas re PlayChip Foundation - Dilution of Shares, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Magdalena Rudzka) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement (Second), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Dennis Drazin, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Daniel Simic, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Brooke Maniscalco, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email from F. Amirbeaggi to L. Mintas re PlayChip Foundation - Dilution of Shares, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration Magdalena Rudzka) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to #25 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 1/6/2022. (Braster, Jennifer)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #14 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/29/2021. For good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing regarding Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for Monday, January 3, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., shall be CONTINUED to Wednesday, January 5, 2022, at 1:00 p.m., IN PERSON in Courtroom 7D. Furthermore, for good cause appearing, the new expiration date for the Temporary Restraining Order, which is currently set to expire on January 3, 2022, is extended to January 5, 2022, at 5:00 p.m. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2).(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Douglas B. Tumminello and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer K. Hostetler (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6745019) by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Laila Mintas. Replies due by 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Braster, Jennifer)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/22/2021. Pending before the Court is the #16 Motion to for Leave to File Under Seal, filed by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc. ("Plaintiff"). In the #16 Motion, Plaintiff seeks leave to file, under seal, the Letter Agreement dated August 27, 2021 (the "Agreement"), and to redact all references to the terms and negotiations related to the Agreement in the Affidavit of Daniel Simic in Exhibit 1 to the #1 Complaint. (See Pl.'s Mot. for Leave to File Under Seal 1:14-17). On December 3, 2021, this Court sealed Exhibit 1 to the Complaint in its #11 Order. (See Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part 14:19-21, ECF No. #11 ). Given that Plaintiff's requested documents are already under seal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/21/2021. By Deputy Clerk: NEV.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the hearing regarding Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for Monday, January 3, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., shall be held IN PERSON in Courtroom 7D. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)(Minute order mailed to defendant).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PlayUp, Inc. re #17 Order on Motion for Service by Publication,,,. Laila Mintas served on 12/17/2021. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #16 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #15 Motion for for Substituted Service of Dr. Laila Mintas. Plaintiff shall file proof of service with the Court within seven (7) days after service is effectuated. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 VIEW Corrected Image #18 re: MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the FTX Letter Agreement and to Redact All References thereto to Exhibit 1 to the Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc. (Hostetler, Jennifer) Modified on 12/20/2021 (SLD).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Emergency MOTION EMERGENCY Motion for Substituted Service of Dr. Laila Mintas re #13 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - (First Attempt) Affidavit of Due Diligence, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - (Second & Third Attempts) Affidavit of Due Diligence, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 - Report, #4 Exhibit Exh 4 - 12-03-2021 Email from Dr. Mintas, #5 Exhibit Exh 5 - 12-04-2021 Emails between Dr. Mintas and F. Amirbeaggi, #6 Exhibit Exh 6 - 12-06-2021 Emails from D. Berhanu, #7 Exhibit Exh 7 - December 9 Email Redacted, #8 Exhibit Exh 8 - 12-09-2021 Email from F. Amirbeaggi, #9 Exhibit Exh 9 - 12-13-2021 Email with A. Golden, #10 Exhibit Exh 10 - 12-13-2021 iGaming Article, #11 Exhibit Exh 11 - 12-13-2021 USBets Article, #12 Exhibit Exh 12 - Declaration of Jennifer K. Hostetler ISO Emergency Motion for Substituted Service) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Extend Time - The new expiration date for the Temporary Restraining Order is 1/3/2022. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order 12/20/2021 at 5:00 p.m. As to the #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Responses are due by 12/27/2021 and Replies are due by 12/29/2021. The Motion Hearing is reset for 1/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) regarding Order Granting Emergency Motion for Ex Parte TRO re #11 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Temporary Restraining Order,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 12-02-2021 Email from L. Horvath, #3 Exhibit Report, #4 Exhibit 12-03-2021 Email from Dr. Mintas, #5 Exhibit 12-04-2021 Emails between Dr. Mintas and F. Amirbeaggi, #6 Exhibit 12-06-2021 Emails from D. Berhanu) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits Attached to the Complaint. Clerk's Office directed to seal Exhibit 1 of the #1 Complaint. Plaintiff to file a redacted copy of Exhibit 1. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order by Monday, December 6, 2021. Deadlines for #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as follows:Responses due by 12/13/2021. Replies due by 12/15/2021. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Lodging Federal Court of Australia's Order Regarding Dr. Laila Mintas by PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by PlayUp, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent PlayUp Limited, Other Affiliate Fan Technologies Pty Limited, Other Affiliate PlayUp Australia Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Fanma Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Fantigma Pty Limited, Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive Pty Limited, Other Affiliate TopBetta Pty Limited, Other Affiliate PlayUp Digital Pty Limited, Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive NJ Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive CO Inc., Other Affiliate Fan Technologies Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive IN Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive IA Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive ND Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive WV Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive PA Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive FL Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive IL Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive OH Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive WY Inc., Other Affiliate PlayUp Interactive AZ Inc. for PlayUp, Inc. added. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laila Mintas re #1 Complaint. (KF)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Dr. Laila Mintas by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc. Responses due by 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jennifer K. Hostetler Declaration) (Hostetler, Jennifer) Modified on 12/1/2021 (EDS).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile the Motion for Preliminary Injunction contained in ECF No. #2 and be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (EDS)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (Sent email to chambers to notify on this motion- KF)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff PlayUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jennifer K. Hostetler Declaration) (Hostetler, Jennifer)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6715714) by PlayUp, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Daniel Simic Affidavit and Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 2 - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - Ross Benson Affidavit and Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 4 - Farshad Amirbeaggi Affidavit and Exhibits, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hostetler, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PlayUp, Inc. v. Mintas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PlayUp, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer K. Hostetler
Represented By: Michael Popok
Represented By: Douglas B Tumminello
Represented By: Amanda Brookhyser
Represented By: Yohania T. Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Laila Mintas
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Benjamin Bradwell Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PlayUp Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Daniel Simic
Represented By: Michael Popok
Represented By: Amanda Brookhyser
Represented By: Yohania T. Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Drazin
Represented By: Amanda Brookhyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Feridun Mintas
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?