Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Research Development Foundation
Plaintiff: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Research Development Foundation
Case Number: 2:2021cv02241
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Daniel Scott Leventhal, James S. Renard, Jaime Stark, and Zachary Wegmann to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/2/2022. (no image attached) (MR)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Research Development Foundation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Peterson, Karen)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/2/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Research Development Foundation. filed by Research Development Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Peterson, Karen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #13 Order, addressed to Andrew Walter. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender" No new address. (JQC)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation to Extend time to Answer #1 Complaint. Research Development Foundation answer due 2/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Spinelli, Debra) Modified text on 1/5/2022 (MR).
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Gregg F LoCascio, P.C. for Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Andrew B. Walter for Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Justin Bova for Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Ryan P. Kane for Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gregg F. LoCascio and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Debra L. Spinelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6747307) by Plaintiff Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Research Development Foundation. (JQC)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Andrew Walter, Gregg LoCascio, Justin Bova, and Ryan Patrick Kane to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/10/2022. (no image attached) (KF)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew B. Walter and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Debra L. Spinelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6742232) by Plaintiff Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Justin Bova and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Debra L. Spinelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6742230) by Plaintiff Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ryan P. Kane and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Debra L. Spinelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6742229) by Plaintiff Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Pacira BioSciences, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Research Development Foundation (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6742223) by Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spinelli, Debra) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Research Development Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Spinelli
Represented By: Andrew Walter
Represented By: Gregg LoCascio
Represented By: Justin Bova
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Development Foundation
Represented By: Daniel Scott Leventhal
Represented By: Jaime Stark
Represented By: James S. Renard
Represented By: Karen A Peterson
Represented By: Zachary Wegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?