Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., LTD et al v. D&B Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., LTD and First 2 Market Products, LLC
Defendant: D&B Sales, Inc., Dale Irwin and Bobbi Irwin
Case Number: 2:2022cv00030
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., LTD, First 2 Market Products, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Edwards, Michael)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to D&B Sales, Inc., Bobbi Irwin, and Dale Irwin re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (KF)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent. Mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KF)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 5, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (KF)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6751609) by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., LTD, First 2 Market Products, LLC. Proof of service due by 4/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons D&B Sales, Inc., #7 Summons Dale Irwin, #8 Summons Bobbi Irwin) (Edwards, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., LTD et al v. D&B Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., LTD
Represented By: Michael Edwards
Represented By: Derek R Noack
Represented By: Stephanie D. Bedker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First 2 Market Products, LLC
Represented By: Michael Edwards
Represented By: Derek R Noack
Represented By: Stephanie D. Bedker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&B Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?