Anderson v. State of NV, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Kenneth Anderson
Defendant: State of NV, Eighth Judicial District Court, Charles Thompson, Brain Sandoval, Regional Justice Center and Chief Justice
Case Number: 2:2022cv00127
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Anthony Kenneth Anderson. Responses due by 4/7/2022. (HKL)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-00127-RFB-BNW. (no image attached) (EDS)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/4/2022. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, by Anthony Kenneth Anderson. (DRM)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion With-out Pre-Judice, Notice of Caveat, by Anthony Kenneth Anderson. (DRM)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Anthony Kenneth Anderson. Adds new parties. (HKL)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/25/2022. So that the record is clear in this case, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 1) is GRANTED (as explained in the Court's order at ECF No. 4).(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EmG)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. Electronic filing of prisoner filings in civil rights cases at Southern Desert Correctional Center is now mandatory under General Order 2012-01. (YAW) Edit text entry to include SDCC; NEF regenerated on 2/23/2022 (YAW).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend; the Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the prisoner, pro se form complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Amended Complaint deadline: 3/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: prisoner, pro se form complaint mailed to P - YAW)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (YAW)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Anthony Kenneth Anderson. (YAW)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Kenneth Anderson. (Attachments: #1 1983 Civil Rights Complaint) (YAW)
January 24, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. State of NV, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kenneth Anderson
Represented By: Southern Desert Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighth Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?