Decanio v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Decanio
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00356
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that in order to create a caseload for U.S. District Judge Cristina D. Silva, this case is reassigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-00356-CDS-NJK. (no image attached) (AF)
March 22, 2022 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.)
March 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.)
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff James Decanio. Replies due by 3/23/2022. (Hengstler, Joel)
March 16, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/17/2022. (Carlson, Jonathan)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/25/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/12/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 3/18/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (JQC)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company for GEICO Advantage Insurance Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-21-845137-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6809350) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 25, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decanio v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Decanio
Represented By: Bradley J. Myers
Represented By: Joel S Hengstler
Represented By: Michael C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Frank A. Toddre, II
Represented By: Stacy Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?