McKinnon et al v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa McKinnon and Todd McKinnon
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Interested Party: Katina Koeth and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00422
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Filing 23 TRANSMITTAL RETURN. Transferred case opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 1:22cv02018 on 4/21/2022. (KF)
April 19, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per #21 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order. (SLD)
April 19, 2022 Filing 22 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of Northern District of Illinois. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (JQC)
April 19, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -1). Signed by MDL Panel on 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 15, 2022 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on April 15, 2022.RE: Unopposed motion to extend deadlines (ECF No. #19 ), and motion to stay case (ECF No. #12 ).IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that, good cause appearing, defendants' unopposed motion to extend deadlines (ECF No. #19 ), be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Defendants have up to and including May 16, 2022, to file a response to plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (ECF No. #7 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, because the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issued its ruling on Abbott's 28 U.S.C. 1407 motion to transfer on April 8, 2022, defendants' motion to stay case (ECF No. #12 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 15, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) Defendants' April 15 Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate re #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Teegarden, Tara)
April 7, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa McKinnon, Todd McKinnon. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC waiver sent on 3/23/2022 4/7/2022, answer due 6/6/2022; Mead Johnson Nutrition Company waiver sent on 3/23/2022 4/7/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Romano, John) Modified date of service on 4/7/2022 (SLD).
April 7, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiffs Lisa McKinnon, Todd McKinnon. Replies due by 4/14/2022. (Lee, James)
March 25, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on March 25, 2022.RE: Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company's motion to extend time (ECF No. #15 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, good cause appearing, defendants' motion (ECF No. #15 ) is GRANTED in part. The deadline to respond to plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (ECF Nos. #7 ; #8 ) is extended from March 26, 2022, to April 15, 2022; enough time for the court to receive full briefing on the motion to stay (ECF No. #12 ). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 24, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) The Mead Johnson Defendants Motion For Extension Of March 26 Response Deadline (First Request) re #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Teegarden, Tara)
March 23, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion to Extend Deadline by Abbott Laboratories, Inc. re #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Medley Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit B - Medley Motion to Extend Time) (Solis-Rainey, Rosa)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 APPENDIX Appendix In Support Of The Mead Johnson Defendants Motion To Stay to #12 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Teegarden, Tara)
March 23, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. Responses due by 4/6/2022. (Teegarden, Tara)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to John Fletcher Romano and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to James Lee as to Lisa McKinnon and Todd McKinnon. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/18/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lisa McKinnon, Todd McKinnon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lee, James)
March 16, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Fletcher Romano and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J Lee (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6830831) by Plaintiffs Lisa McKinnon, Todd McKinnon. (Lee, James)
March 15, 2022 Filing 8 JOINDER to #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs Lisa McKinnon, Todd McKinnon. (Lee, James)
March 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion to Consolidate Pursuant to Local Rule 42-1(b) by Interested Party Katina Koeth. Responses due by 3/26/2022. (Claggett, Sean)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John F. Romano and Marjorie Levine to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/24/2022. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge James C. Mahan for all further proceedings per 4 Minute Order. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-00422-JCM-EJY. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/10/2022. By Deputy Clerk: NEV. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 8, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mead Johnson & Company, LLC re #1 Complaint. (YAW)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
March 7, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (YAW)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6821912) by Lisa McKinnon, Todd McKinnon. Proof of service due by 6/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lee, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinnon et al v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McKinnon
Represented By: James J. Lee
Represented By: John F. Romano
Represented By: Marjorie Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd McKinnon
Represented By: James J. Lee
Represented By: John F. Romano
Represented By: Marjorie Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
Represented By: Tara U Teegarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Represented By: Tara U Teegarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Katina Koeth
Represented By: Sean K Claggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Rosa Solis-Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?