Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC5 and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00547
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/26/2022. Motions due by 1/25/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Dragon, Lindsay)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal. North American Title Insurance Company answer due 5/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
April 27, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 18, 2022 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Other Affiliate Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A. for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company added. (Dragon, Lindsay)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. North American Title Insurance Company served on 4/6/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by North American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Doma Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent CalAtlantic Title Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Lennar Financial Services, LLC, Corporate Parent LFS Holding Company, LLC for North American Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/1/2022. By Deputy Clerk: K. Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/16/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kevin S. Sinclair to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/15/2022. (no image attached) (KF)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 31, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-850466-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6850544) by North American Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 6/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibits 1-9 to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibits 10-14 to State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibits 15-19 to State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibits 20-21 to State Court Complaint, #7 Exhibit 22 to State Court Complaint, #8 Exhibit 23 to State Court Complaint, #9 Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #10 Statement of Redomestication) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC5
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay Dragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay Dragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?