United States of America v. Christensen et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cody J. Christensen, Sara Christensen, Republic Silver State Disposal, Las Vegas Valley Water District and Clark County, Nevada
Case Number: 2:2022cv00605
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. Cody J. Christensen answer due 7/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) Modified Judge's signature date on 6/3/2022 (SLD).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to the United States' #1 Complaint Re: Defendant Cody Christensen, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Green, Tijuhna) Modified event on 6/1/2022 (SLD).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT MOTION STIPULATION AS TO PRIORITY BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND LAS VEGAS VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Green, Tijuhna) Modified event on 6/1/2022 (SLD).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/25/2022. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #14 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Answer is DENIED without prejudice under Local Rule IA 6-1(a).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Cody Christensen must meet and confer with Plaintiff, the United States, regarding his requested extension. See LR 16-1(d). If the parties can reach an agreement, they may file a stipulation to extend the time for Mr. Christensen to file a responsive pleading. If they cannot reach an agreement, Mr. Christensen may refile his motion. In either event, the stipulation or motion must comply with the Local Rules, including showing good cause for the extension and excusable neglect if the time to file a responsive pleading has lapsed. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/25/2022. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #13 Defendant's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. The Court typically grants motions to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") for individuals filing a civil action (not defendants responding to a civil action), as there is no need to pay a filing fee to begin the case. Defendant Cody Christensen is, of course, still able to proceed pro se (i.e., represent himself). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Mr. Christensen wants the Court to consider additional information regarding why the Court should allow him to proceed IFP, he may refile his request with an explanation regarding why he needs to proceed IFP. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Answer #1 Complaint, by Defendant Cody J. Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (KF)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Cody J. Christensen. (KF)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation as to Priority Between the United States and Clark County. Defendant Clark County is Dismissed from this case. Each party to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/23/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Republic Silver State Disposal served on 4/28/2022. (Green, Tijuhna)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens) (Green, Tijuhna)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #8 Stipulation by Plaintiff United States of America. (Green, Tijuhna)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION As to Priority Between the United States and Clark County re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Green, Tijuhna)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Valley Water District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smyth, James)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Sara Christensen served on 5/1/2022. (Green, Tijuhna)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cody J. Christensen served on 5/1/2022. (Green, Tijuhna)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Las Vegas Valley Water District. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/26/2022.(Smyth, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James E. Smyth, II on behalf of Defendant Las Vegas Valley Water District. (Smyth, James)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cody J. Christensen, Sara Christensen, Clark County, Nevada, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Republic Silver State Disposal re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (KF)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Proof of service due by 7/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1. Cody Christensen, #3 Summons 2. Sara Christensen, #4 Summons 3. Republic Silver State Disposal, #5 Summons 4. Las Vegas Valley Water District, #6 Summons 5. Clark County, Nevada) (Green, Tijuhna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Christensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tijuhna Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody J. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Valley Water District
Represented By: Gregory J Walch
Represented By: James E. Smyth, II
Represented By: Laura E. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County, Nevada
Represented By: Sarah Schaerrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?