Joseph v. Manaso Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Michele Joseph
Defendant: Manaso Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00623
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Joseph re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Manaso Investments, LLC served on 5/16/2022. (Spretnak, Robert)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly assigned to District Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (SLD)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Owen B. Dunn Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert P. Spretnak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manaso Investments, LLC re #1 Complaint. (KF)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 5/5/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (KF)
April 13, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (KF)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Owen B. Dunn Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert P. Spretnak (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6867458) by Plaintiff Michele Joseph. (Spretnak, Robert)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michele Joseph. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Spretnak, Robert)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manaso Investments, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6867452) by Michele Joseph. Proof of service due by 7/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Manaso Investments) (Spretnak, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Manaso Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Joseph
Represented By: Robert P Spretnak
Represented By: Owen B. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manaso Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?