SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Newrez LLC
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Defendant: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 2:2022cv00626
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Responses due by 6/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Schimming, Chantel)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Newrez LLC answer due 6/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Newrez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. Newrez LLC answer due 5/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Newrez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Newrez LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Other Affiliate Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corporation for Newrez LLC added. (Magaster, Paige)
April 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paige Magaster on behalf of Defendant Newrez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melanie D Morgan on behalf of Defendant Newrez LLC. (Morgan, Melanie)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Newrez LLC served on 4/18/2022. (Schimming, Chantel)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate SFR Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate SFR Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate Xiemen Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Xiemen Investments, Ltd., Other Affiliate John Gibson for SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC added. (Schimming, Chantel)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Schimming, Chantel)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Newrez LLC. (JQC)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6868692) by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Proof of service due by 7/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Schimming, Chantel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 14, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Newrez LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Chantel Marie Schimming
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Paige Magaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?