SG Gaming, Inc. v. Irarrazaval
Plaintiff: SG Gaming, Inc.
Defendant: Juan Pablo Irarrazaval
Case Number: 2:2022cv00890
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting ECF No. #15 Stipulation re ESI Protocol, Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #3 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Juan Pablo Irarrazaval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Michel, Carol)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION ESI Protocol by Plaintiff SG Gaming, Inc.. (Erwin, Philip) (other) (discovery)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff SG Gaming, Inc... (Erwin, Philip)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff SG Gaming, Inc... (Erwin, Philip)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SG Gaming, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Light & Wonder, Inc. f/k/a Scientific Games Corporation for SG Gaming, Inc. added. (Erwin, Philip)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Stipulation to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. #9 Response re ECF No. #3 Motion to Dismiss due by 7/28/2022. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #3 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Juan Pablo Irarrazaval. by Defendant Juan Pablo Irarrazaval. (Michel, Carol) (extend) (sumjgm)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to #3 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff SG Gaming, Inc.. Replies due by 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip E. Erwin, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Parente, #3 Exhibit B - Juan Pablo Irarrazaval LinkedIn Profile, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Abel Atchabahian, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Alberto Tanaillon, #6 Exhibit E - Employment and Employee Benefits in Argentina Overview, #7 Exhibit F - Deron Hunsberger LinkedIn Profile, #8 Exhibit G - Ainsworth Press Release)(Erwin, Philip)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Juan Pablo Irarrazaval.. (Michel, Carol)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to #3 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/7/2022. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #3 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff SG Gaming, Inc.. (Erwin, Philip)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Juan Pablo Irarrazaval. (Michel, Carol)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Juan Pablo Irarrazaval. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Michel, Carol)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Juan Pablo Irarrazaval. Responses due by 6/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Juan Pablo Irarrazaval, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Emilio Carlos Sojo) (Michel, Carol)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/3/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/18/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-836693-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6927841) by Juan Pablo Irarrazaval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Michel, Carol) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SG Gaming, Inc. v. Irarrazaval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SG Gaming, Inc.
Represented By: Philip R Erwin
Represented By: Samuel R. Mirkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Pablo Irarrazaval
Represented By: Carol P. Michel
Represented By: Jonathan J Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?