PLM Lender Services Inc. v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: PLM Lender Services Inc.
Defendant: Alfred Peters, United States of America, Montara Estates Homeowners Association, Republic Silver State Disposal, Bloomnet, Inc., Clark County, Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service, Republic Silver State Disposal Inc. doing business as Republic Services and Tax Receiver of the County of Clark
Case Number: 2:2022cv00929
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader and Claim for Excess Proceeds filed by Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service.(Green, Tijuhna)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #9 For good cause shown, that request is GRANTED. The deadline tofile a motion for a scheduling conference is EXTENDED to September 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bloomnet, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Dubowsky, Peter)
July 8, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal filed by Bloomnet, Inc..(Dubowsky, Peter) Modified text on 7/12/2022 (EDS).
July 8, 2022 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Proofs of Service, #2 Exhibit 2. Clark County Disclaimer)(Green, Tijuhna)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Montara Estates Homeowners Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Hastings, Ryan)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Montara Estates Homeowners Association's Answer to Complaint in Interpleader and Claim for Excess Proceeds filed by Montara Estates Homeowners Association. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/21/2022.(Hastings, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service. (Green, Tijuhna)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation to extend the United States' Response Deadline. Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service answer due 7/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) For the United States to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service. (Green, Tijuhna)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/9/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/24/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-851514-C, by United States of America. Proof of service due by 7/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. Complaint) (Green, Tijuhna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 9, 2022 Attorney update in case: Attorneys Sean L. Anderson and Ryan D Hastings for Montara Estates Homeowners Association ; Attorneys Hugo Hernandez-Diaz, Darren T Brenner, and Rock K. Jung for PLM Lender Services Inc. added. (DRS)
June 9, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLM Lender Services Inc. v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLM Lender Services Inc.
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Hugo Hernandez-Diaz
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tijuhna Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montara Estates Homeowners Association
Represented By: Ryan D Hastings
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomnet, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Dubowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Tijuhna Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal Inc. doing business as Republic Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Receiver of the County of Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?