Snow Covered Capital, LLC v. Fonfa et al
Plaintiff: Snow Covered Capital, LLC
Defendant: Jodi Fonfa, Evan Fonfa, The Evan Fonfa 2018 Trust dated December 26, 2018 and Evan Fonfa as trustee
Case Number: 2:2022cv01181
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to #45 Motion for Reconsideration by Defendant Jodi Fonfa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Jimmerson, James)
December 27, 2022 Filing 46 RESPONSE to #45 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. Replies due by 1/3/2023. (Olson, Bob)
December 13, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Reconsideration re #44 Order on Motion to Strike,,, by Defendant Jodi Fonfa. Responses due by 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration)(Jimmerson, James) (MJorder)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #40 Motion to Strike JodiFonfa's #34 Answer to first amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 11/30/2022- Linked Answer at #34 - (JQC).
November 14, 2022 Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 11/14/2022. Defendant Evan Fonfa moves to dismiss plaintiff Snow Covered Capitals complaint. ECF No. #27 . After Fonfa filed his dismissal motion, Snow Covered Capital filed a first-amended complaint which superseded its initial complaint. ECF No. #31 . And Fonfa has already filed a new motion to dismiss the first-amended complaint. ECF No. #33 . Because the initial complaint has been superseded, Fonfa's initial motion to dismiss (ECF No. #27 ) is DENIED as moot.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
November 3, 2022 Filing 42 Clerk's Notice re: #41 . Incorrect event selected by attorney. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IA 11-6(b), which states: No attorney may withdraw after appearing in a case except by leave of the court after notice has been served on the affected client and opposing counsel. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. 35 using the appropriate Motion/Stipulation pursuant to LR IA 11-6(b). Document #41 terminated.Please Note: Counsel is also reminded to include the Judge's signature box on the document pursuant to LR IA 6-2: A stipulation or ex parte or unopposed motion must include an "order" in the form of a signature block on which the court or clerk can endorse approval of the relief sought. This signature block must not begin on a separate page. (no image attached) (DRS)
November 2, 2022 Filing 41 Improperly filed by counsel. Directed to re-file at 42 . NOTICE Withdrawal of Jason P. Fulton by Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (McCarthy, James) Modified on 11/3/2022 (DRS).
October 28, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. Responses due by 11/11/2022. (McCarthy, James) (answer)
October 28, 2022 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #33 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Evan Fonfa as trustee. (Dwiggins, Dana)
October 21, 2022 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #33 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. Replies due by 10/28/2022. (McCarthy, James)
October 20, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (TRW)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #35 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/2/2023. Motions due by 7/1/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 18, 2022 Filing 35 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC.. (McCarthy, James)
October 7, 2022 Filing 34 STRICKEN per #44 Order (JQC) ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint filed by Jodi Fonfa.(Jimmerson, James)
October 7, 2022 Filing 33 First MOTION to Dismiss #31 Amended Complaint by Defendants Evan Fonfa as trustee, Evan Fonfa. Responses due by 10/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I, #2 Appendix Volume II)(Dwiggins, Dana)
September 23, 2022 Filing 32 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (McCarthy, James)
September 23, 2022 Filing 31 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Snow Covered Capital, LLC. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (McCarthy, James)
September 20, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #27 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. Replies due by 9/27/2022. (McCarthy, James)
September 6, 2022 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/6/2022. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #27 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 2, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Jodi Fonfa.(Jimmerson, James)
September 2, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Evan Fonfa as trustee, Evan Fonfa. Responses due by 9/16/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/17/2022. (Dwiggins, Dana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 2, 2022 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Evan Fonfa as trustee, Evan Fonfa. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dwiggins, Dana)
September 2, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana A. Dwiggins on behalf of Defendants Evan Fonfa as trustee, Evan Fonfa. (Dwiggins, Dana)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice David Reynolds and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/8/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice James D. McCarthy and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/8/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason Paul Fulton for Snow Covered Capital, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/8/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary Ann Joerres for Snow Covered Capital, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/8/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 8, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #9 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Issued. Evan Fonfa served on 8/4/2022. (Olson, Bob)
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #10 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Evan Fonfa as trustee served on 8/4/2022. (Olson, Bob)
August 8, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #11 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. The Evan Fonfa 2018 Trust dated December 26, 2018 served on 8/4/2022. (Olson, Bob)
August 8, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #12 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Jodi Fonfa served on 8/4/2022. (Olson, Bob)
August 5, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary Ann Joerres and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7000336) by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
August 5, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Fulton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7000304) by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
August 5, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David Reynolds and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7000299) by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
August 5, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James D. McCarthy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bob L. Olson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7000287) by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Jodi Fonfa served on 8/2/2022. (Olson, Bob)
August 2, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. The Evan Fonfa 2018 Trust dated December 26, 2018 served on 7/31/2022. (Olson, Bob)
August 2, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Evan Fonfa as trustee served on 7/31/2022. (Olson, Bob)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Snow Covered Capital, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Evan Fonfa served on 7/31/2022. (Olson, Bob)
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 Disregard - CLERK'S NOTICE. Issue clarified by counsel. No corrections necessary. (DRS) Modified to disregard on 7/26/2022 (DRS).
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Evan Fonfa, Jodi Fonfa, The Evan Fonfa 2018 Trust dated December 26, 2018. (JQC)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued The Evan Fonfa 2018 Trust dated December 26, 2018 by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Evan Fonfa, as Trustee of The Evan Fonfa 2018 Trust dated December 26, 2018 by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Evan Fonfa by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Jodi Fonfa by Plaintiff Snow Covered Capital, LLC. (Olson, Bob)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Snow Covered Capital, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Associate Capital LLC, Corporate Parent 1421 Capital LLC, Corporate Parent Nellie Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate Landa, Enrique, Other Affiliate Harsch V, Griff for Snow Covered Capital, LLC added. (Olson, Bob)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6982944) by Snow Covered Capital, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Recourse Obligations Guaranty, #2 Exhibit 2 - Post-Nuptial Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Allure Condo Deed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Promissory Note - Evan Fonfa Trust to Andrew Fonfa, #5 Exhibit 5 - Promissory Note - Haley Fonfa Trust to Andrew Fonfa, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Bob) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 22, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow Covered Capital, LLC v. Fonfa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snow Covered Capital, LLC
Represented By: James Dennis McCarthy
Represented By: Bob L. Olson
Represented By: Jason Paul Fulton
Represented By: Mary Ann Joerres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Fonfa
Represented By: James Joseph Jimmerson
Represented By: James M. Jimmerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Fonfa
Represented By: Jacob D Crawley
Represented By: Dana A. Dwiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Evan Fonfa 2018 Trust dated December 26, 2018
Represented By: Dana A. Dwiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Fonfa as trustee
Represented By: Jacob D Crawley
Represented By: Dana A. Dwiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?