Stokes v. Olympian Leisure Services
Plaintiff: Michael Stokes
Defendant: Olympian Leisure Services doing business as Entourage Vegas Spa and Health Club
Case Number: 2:2022cv01228
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, Olympian Leisure Services answer due 10/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 20, 2022 Filing 12 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Olympian Leisure Services. (Arnold, Harry) (extend) (answer)
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Olympian Leisure Services. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Hardy, Brian) Modified by Clerk's Office to add Christopher Campbell as an interested party on 9/22/2022 (EDS).
September 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Harry L. Arnold on behalf of Defendant Olympian Leisure Services. (Arnold, Harry)
September 9, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Stokes re #1 Complaint,,. Olympian Leisure Services served on 9/1/2022. (Sanders, Craig)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Craig B. Sanders and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/30/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 25, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (EDS)
August 19, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Craig B. Sanders and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7017341) by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing)(Olsen, Eric)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Olympian Leisure Services re #1 Complaint (HAM)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (HAM)
August 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 8/22/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (HAM)
August 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Michael Stokes.. (Olsen, Eric)
August 1, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Stokes that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Olsen, Eric)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Olympian Leisure Services d/b/a Entourage Vegas Spa and Health Club (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6992728) by Michael Stokes. Proof of service due by 10/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olsen, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 1, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Olympian Leisure Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stokes
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Represented By: Craig Sanders
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympian Leisure Services doing business as Entourage Vegas Spa and Health Club
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Harry L. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?