Adams v. Boulware II et al
Plaintiff: Brandon G Adams
Defendant: Judge Richard F Boulware II, Judge Daniel J Albregts, Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, Judge Gloria M. Navarro, Judge Kent J. Dawson, Judge Craig S. Denney, Judge Andrew P. Gordon, Molly C. Dwyer, Melita Morrison-Johnson and Yelena A. Williams
Case Number: 2:2022cv01234
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
2 Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/29/2022. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Document Submitted for Filing, #2 Document Submitted for Filing, #3 Document Submitted for Filing, #4 Document Submitted for Filing, #5 Document Submitted for Filing, #6 Document Submitted for Filing, #7 Document Submitted for Filing, #8 Document Submitted for Filing, #9 Document Submitted for Filing, #10 Document Submitted for Filing, #11 Document Submitted for Filing, #12 Document Submitted for Filing, #13 Document Submitted for Filing, #14 Document Submitted for Filing, #15 Document Submitted for Filing, #16 Document Submitted for Filing, #17 Document Submitted for Filing, #18 Document Submitted for Filing, #19 Document Submitted for Filing, #20 Document Submitted for Filing, #21 Document Submitted for Filing, #22 Document Submitted for Filing, #23 Document Submitted for Filing, #24 Document Submitted for Filing, #25 Document Submitted for Filing, #26 Document Submitted for Filing, #27 Document Submitted for Filing, #28 Document Submitted for Filing, #29 Document Submitted for Filing, #30 Document Submitted for Filing, #31 Document Submitted for Filing, #32 Document Submitted for Filing, #33 Document Submitted for Filing, #34 Document Submitted for Filing, #35 Document Submitted for Filing, #36 Document Submitted for Filing, #37 Document Submitted for Filing, #38 Document Submitted for Filing, #39 Document Submitted for Filing, #40 Document Submitted for Filing)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
September 28, 2022 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/28/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Document Submitted for Filing, #2 Document Submitted for Filing, #3 Document Submitted for Filing)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
September 28, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT submitted to the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit by Plaintiff Brandon G Adams. (TRW)
September 28, 2022 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/28/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Document Submitted for Filing, #2 Document Submitted for Filing, #3 Document Submitted for Filing, #4 Document Submitted for Filing, #5 Document Submitted for Filing, #6 Document Submitted for Filing, #7 Document Submitted for Filing, #8 Document Submitted for Filing)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. (Attachments: #1 COL, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Brandon G Adams. (TRW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Brandon G Adams. (TRW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/15/2022. Every document you submit to the Court must include your name, address, and telephone number in the upper left hand corner of the first page. The caption on the first page must include the title of this Court, the title of the action, the case number assigned to this action (including all initials and letters that follow the number), and the title of your document. If you are pursuing more than one action in t his Court, you must submit a separate original document with the appropriate case number for each action in which you want the document filed. (Local Rule IA 10-2). A document requesting a court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter. See Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7. Letters to a judge will be disregarded (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 tracking, #3 COL, #4 receipt, #5 tracking) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 11, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Brandon G Adams. (KF)
August 8, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon Adams by Plaintiff Brandon G Adams. (LOE)
August 6, 2022 Filing 15 Affidavit by Brandon G Adams. (LOE)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Adams' repeated waste of Court time and resources impedes the adjudication of other pending matters. It Is Thus Ordered for him to show cause in writing by September 2, 2022, why he should not be deemed a vexatious litigant and subjected to a permanent pre-filing injunction. Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2022. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 4, 2022 Filing 14 Certified Mail by Brandon G Adams. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail)(LOE)
August 4, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Brandon G Adams. (LOE)
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 Violation warning by Brandon G Adams. (Attachments: #1 violation warning, #2 certified mail)(LOE)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach for all further proceedings per #2 Order. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-01234-CDS-VCF. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LOE)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe recuses himself/herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 1, 2022 Filing 12 Affidavit by Brandon G Adams. (LOE)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 DMV letter by Brandon G Adams. (Attachments: #1 violation warning, #2 affidavit, #3 violation warning, #4 certified mail)(LOE)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 Affidavit by Brandon G Adams. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail, #2 violation warning)(LOE)
August 1, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon Adams by Plaintiff Brandon G Adams. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail, #2 violation warning, #3 affidavit, #4 affidavit, #5 certified mail)(LOE)
August 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Violation warning by Brandon G Adams. (Attachments: #1 Mail Receipt)(LOE)
August 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of violation Warning by Brandon G Adams. (Attachments: #1 affidavit)(LOE)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LOE)
August 1, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (TRW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Boulware II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Richard F Boulware II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Daniel J Albregts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Gloria M. Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Kent J. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Craig S. Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Andrew P. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melita Morrison-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelena A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?