Corson v. Executive Realty Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Defendant: Executive Realty Services, Inc. and Donald Edward Klein
Case Number: 2:2022cv01292
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 First Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint. Executive Realty Services, Inc. answer due 10/11/2022; Donald Edward Klein answer due 10/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 8 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Executive Realty Services, Inc., Donald Edward Klein. (Simpson, Taylor) (extend) (answer)
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Corson re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Executive Realty Services, Inc. served on 8/29/2022. (Rothell, Trey)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Corson re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Donald Edward Klein served on 8/22/2022. (Rothell, Trey)
August 12, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Executive Realty Services, Inc., Donald Edward Klein re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KF)
August 12, 2022 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KF)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
August 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lisa Corson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Rothell, Trey)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Executive Realty Services, Inc., Donald Edward Klein (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7007926) by Lisa Corson. Proof of service due by 11/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Executive Realty Services, Inc., #5 Summons - Donald Edward Klein, #6 AO 121 - Report on Filing Copyright Action) (Rothell, Trey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corson v. Executive Realty Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Represented By: Trey Alan Rothell
Represented By: Marc Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Realty Services, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Edward Klein
Represented By: Taylor Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?