Frazier-Swayne v. Clarity Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phylus Frazier-Swayne
Defendant: Clarity Services, Inc. and CNU Online Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01364
Filed: August 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. CNU Online Holdings, LLC answer due 10/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
October 17, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Fourth Request) to Respond to #1 Complaint re #10 Order, by Defendant CNU Online Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 10/31/2022. (Chavez, David) (answer) Modified on 10/18/2022 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Clarity Services, Inc. by Phylus Frazier-Swayne re #1 Complaint,.. (Kind, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. CNU Online Holdings, LLC answer due 10/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
October 10, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) to Respond to #1 Complaint re #8 Order, by Defendant CNU Online Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 10/24/2022. (Chavez, David) (answer) Modified on 10/12/2022 to link document to Order (SLD).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Extend Time (Second Request). CNU Online Holdings, LLC Answer re #1 Complaint due 10/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant CNU Online Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 10/14/2022. (Chavez, David) (answer)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Extend deadline to respond to complaint. CNU Online Holdings, LLC answer due 9/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) and Proposed Order re #1 Complaint, by Defendant CNU Online Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2022. (Chavez, David) (answer)
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CNU Online Holdings, LLC, Clarity Services, Inc. (LOE)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 24, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (LOE)
August 23, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Phylus Frazier-Swayne. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
August 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7021572) by Phylus Frazier-Swayne. Proof of service due by 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier-Swayne v. Clarity Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phylus Frazier-Swayne
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarity Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNU Online Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David Ernesto Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?