EBET, INC v. Jason Finch
Defendant: EBET, INC and Jason Finch
Case Number: 2:2022cv01553
Filed: September 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/14/2023. Plaintiff Ebet, Inc. and defendant Jason Finch stipulate to dismiss this case subject to their settlement agreement. ECF No. #37 . Under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), a plaintiff may use a stipulation to dismiss an action by filing "a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared." Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Once the stipulation between the parties who have appeared is properly filed, no order of the court is necessary to effectuate dismissal. Because the parties have filed a stipulation for dismissal of this case with prejudice that is signed by all whom have made an appearance, this case has terminated. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to close this case.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
September 11, 2023 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO DISMISS With Prejudice by Plaintiff EBET, INC. (Novian, Farhad) (dismiss)
August 30, 2023 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/30/2023. Defendant Jason Finch filed a notice regarding the status of settlement documents seeking additional time to file a stipulation of dismissal. ECF No. #35 . Because the parties need more time to finalize their agreement and the stipulation of dismissal, the request for an extension of time is granted. The deadline for filing the stipulation of dismissal is extended to September 11, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
August 28, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE Regarding Status of Settlement Documents by Jason Finch.. (Gabroy, Christian)
August 7, 2023 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/7/2023. The parties have indicated that they have settled this matter and seek to dismiss this action with prejudice. ECF Nos. #30 , 33 . Their settlement will moot the prior unresolved motion to dismiss, ECF No. #14 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #14 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Should the parties fail to file executed settlement documents by August 28, 2023, I will permit the defendant to move to reactivate the motion and consider it at that time. (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
August 7, 2023 Filing 33 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Michael Van; Def Counsel: Kaine Messer; Recording start and end times: 10:02 - 10:05 am; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appeared via video conference for this hearing. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel. IT IS ORDERED that the proposed stipulation and order for dismissal is due by 8/28/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that a video conference hearing is set for 8/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers - Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/parties must email Courtroom Administrator Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, August 4, 2023. Please see order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties file a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal on or before July 24, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for protective order #24 is DENIED without prejudice. Settlement documents are due by 7/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) Modified on 5/25/2023 (HAM).
May 19, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Resolution in Lieu of Response by Jason Finch re #24 Motion for Protective Order.. (Gabroy, Christian)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 , #28 Stipulation; Discovery due by 9/19/2023. Motions due by 10/19/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) Modified on 3/29/2023 (HAM).
March 24, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order re #26 Order on Stipulation,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings by Defendant Jason Finch. (Gabroy, Christian) (extend) (nondispositive)
March 24, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery Deadlines re #22 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendant Jason Finch. (Gabroy, Christian) (extend) (discovery)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Stipulation Re: #24 Motion for Protective Order. Responses due by 3/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 27, 2023 Filing 25 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #24 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Jason Finch. (Gabroy, Christian) (extend) (nondispositive)
February 13, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff EBET, INC. Responses due by 2/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER BRENDON GURA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF EBET, INC.S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)(Novian, Farhad)
December 8, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #19 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 7/21/2023. Motions due by 8/18/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael C Van terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 7, 2022 Filing 20 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Garrett R. Chase in for Attorney Michael C. Van by Plaintiff EBET, INC. Responses due by 12/21/2022. (Chase, Garrett)
December 5, 2022 Filing 19 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Jason Finch.. (Gabroy, Christian)
November 14, 2022 Filing 18 ERRATA to #17 Reply to #14 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Jason Finch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gabroy, Christian) Modified to link to underlying motion on 11/15/2022 (DRS).
November 11, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #14 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Jason Finch. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits)(Gabroy, Christian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff EBET, INC. Replies due by 11/11/2022. (Kandel, Alexander)
October 21, 2022 Attorney update in case: Attorney Kaine M. Messer added for Defendant Jason Finch as listed on the #14 Motion to Dismiss. (SLD)
October 21, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jason Finch. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gabroy, Christian)
October 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jason Finch. Responses due by 11/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Agreement, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Notice to Unrepresented Defendan Re typo of Real Estate, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Letter to Defedant's Counsel Stating Counsel email went to junk, #5 Exhibit Defendant's letter to Plaintiff re allegations, #6 Exhibit Jason Finch request for leave, #7 Exhibit Jason Finch Description of information, #8 Exhibit Jason Finch's email re thumdrive)(Gabroy, Christian)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Jason Finch Answer re #1 Complaint due 10/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 6, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Jason Finch. (Gabroy, Christian) (extend) (answer)
October 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christian James Gabroy on behalf of Defendant Jason Finch. (Gabroy, Christian)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Farhad Novian for EBET, INC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael C. Van. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Kandel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Brendon Gura and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Farhad Novian and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7066976) by Plaintiff EBET, INC. (Van, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Kandel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7066966) by Plaintiff EBET, INC. (Van, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Brendon Gura and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BNVDC-7066957) by Plaintiff EBET, INC. (Van, Michael)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/30/2022. (no image attached) (HAM)
September 16, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by EBET, INC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Chase, Garrett)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Finch re #1 Complaint. (HAM)
September 16, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
September 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EBET, INC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7050897) by EBET, INC. Proof of service due by 12/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Chase, Garrett) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EBET, INC v. Jason Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBET, INC
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Finch
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?