Wheeler v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wheeler
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, America First Credit Union, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. and Kohl's Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01660
Filed: October 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Cynthia Wheeler. Dismissing Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Kind, Michael)
November 28, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Cynthia Wheeler. Dismissing Kohl's Inc. (Kind, Michael)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Motion to Extend Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 12/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 24, 2022 Filing 20 Second MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 12/8/2022. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
November 21, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Cynthia Wheeler re #1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael)
November 17, 2022 Trans Union LLC Terminated per #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (KF)
November 17, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Cynthia Wheeler. Dismissing Trans Union LLC. (Kind, Michael)
November 14, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. added.. (Armstrong, Karyna)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A..(Armstrong, Karyna)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. answer due 11/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 3, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. Responses due by 11/17/2022. (Armstrong, Karyna) (answer)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/28/2022. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #12 is DENIED without prejudice for failure to show excusable neglect for the late stipulation. See LR IA 6-1(a).(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. Responses due by 11/10/2022. (Armstrong, Karyna) (answer)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
October 26, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by America First Credit Union that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Cuna Mutual Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Cuna Mutual Insurance Society, Other Affiliate Cumis Insurance Society, Inc. for America First Credit Union added. (Pocci, Marisa)
October 26, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by America First Credit Union. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/10/2022.(Pocci, Marisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 11/8/2022. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. Kohl's Inc. answer due 11/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Kohl's Inc.. (Esposito, Michael) (extend) (answer)
October 7, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cynthia Wheeler re #4 Summons Issued. Trans Union, LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2022, answer due 11/30/2022. (Kind, Michael)
October 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (KF)
October 2, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
October 2, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF)
October 1, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cynthia Wheeler. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
October 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7068464) by Cynthia Wheeler. Proof of service due by 12/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wheeler
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Gia Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America First Credit Union
Represented By: Marisa A Pocci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Represented By: Karyna Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?