Houston v. Lombardo et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Travis Houston
Defendant: Sheriff Joe Lombardo, Carolyn Goodman, Miranda M. Du, Calvin Johnson, Tierra Danielle Jones and David M. Jones
Case Number: 2:2022cv01685
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
2 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
3 Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 29, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-01685-CDS-DJA. (no image attached) (EDS)
November 29, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/29/2022. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey recuses herself from this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
November 23, 2022 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUBPOENA to be issued by Plaintiff Matthew Travis Houston. (CJS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying #15 Motion Invoking Local Rule LR IA 1-4 to Set Aside Local Rules of Practice 1-1, 1-2, and 26-7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/27/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 26, 2022 Filing 15 Emergency Ex Parte Letter of MOTION Invoking Local Rule LR IA 1-4 to Set Aside Local Rules of Practice 1-1, 1-2, and 26-7 by Plaintiff Matthew Travis Houston. Responses due by 11/9/2022. (CJS) (misc) (nondispositive)
October 26, 2022 Filing 14 Ex Parte Letter of MOTION as a Joinder to All Cases of the Plaintiff (See 2:19-cv-01472-APG-DJA) "de novo hearing requested" by Plaintiff Matthew Travis Houston. Responses due by 11/9/2022. (CJS)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP Application and Civil Rights Complaint form (attached within). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 11/16/2022, Plaintiff must file a complete IFP Application with the Court or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application and Instructions - to be provided to P through the law library)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2022: #2 Civil Rights Complaint Form - to be provided to P through the law library) (KF). Modified to attach Civil Rights Complaint form and Regenerated NEF on 10/18/2022 (KF).
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-01685-JAD-DJA. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NJK)
October 13, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-01685-JAD-NJK. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 13, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/13/2022. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah recuses herself in this action. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-01685-JAD-EJY. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 11, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/11/2022. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EmG)
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-01685-JAD-BNW. (no image attached) (KF)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER.This case has been assigned to the undersigned Magistrate Judge by random draw. Because his impartiality might reasonably be questioned, the undersigned must recuse himself from the above entitled and numbered case. 28 USC 455 Code of Conduct for United States Judges, Canon 3(C)(1). Accordingly, this matter is hereby referred to the Clerk of Court for random reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-01685-JAD-VCF. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/6/2022. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew Travis Houston. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Points and Authorities; Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRM)
October 5, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Lombardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Travis Houston
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joe Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda M. Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierra Danielle Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?