Manguin et al v. Becker et al
Plaintiff: Jolan Castillo Manguin and Carmen Polistico Manguin
Defendant: John M. Becker, Eddie Jeminez, HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Inc Mortgage Pass through Certificates, Mana Series 2007 2007-A2, Western Progressive-Nevada Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv01711
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors, Inc., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, MANA Series 2007-A2; Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC; PHH Mortgage Corporation (PHH), and Western Progressive-Nevada Inc. are dismissed from this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 NON-OPPOSITION to #7 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Inc Mortgage Pass through Certificates, Mana Series 2007 2007-A2, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC., PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive-Nevada Inc.. (Riether, Robert)
November 28, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Non-Monetary Status re #1 Complaint by Defendant Western Progressive-Nevada Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Riether, Robert)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/9/2022. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #7 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 8, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by PHH Mortgage Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation added. (Riether, Robert)
November 8, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Western Progressive-Nevada Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.a.r.l. for Western Progressive-Nevada Inc. added. (Riether, Robert)
November 8, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Inc Mortgage Pass through Certificates, Mana Series 2007 2007-A2 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate HSBC Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings, PLC for HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Inc Mortgage Pass through Certificates, Mana Series 2007 2007-A2 added. (Riether, Robert)
November 8, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate PHH Corporation, Other Affiliate Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. added. (Riether, Robert)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendants HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Inc Mortgage Pass through Certificates, Mana Series 2007 2007-A2, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC., PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive-Nevada Inc.. Responses due by 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Riether, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christina Miller on behalf of Defendants HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Inc Mortgage Pass through Certificates, Mana Series 2007 2007-A2, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC., PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive-Nevada Inc.. (Miller, Christina)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (TRW)
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens/Superseding Superior Lis Pendens, MOTION for Order Declaring Jolan-Castillo Manguin is entitled to Property and Assignment of Deed by Plaintiff Jolan Castillo Manguin. Responses due by 10/25/2022. (TRW) (misc) Modified event on 10/12/2022 (SLD).
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402, receipt number 200000729. (TRW)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Carmen Polistico Manguin, Jolan Castillo Manguin. Proof of service due by 1/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TRW)
October 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manguin et al v. Becker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolan Castillo Manguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Polistico Manguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Jeminez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Inc Mortgage Pass through Certificates, Mana Series 2007 2007-A2
Represented By: Robert A Riether
Represented By: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive-Nevada Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Riether
Represented By: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.
Represented By: Robert A Riether
Represented By: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Robert A Riether
Represented By: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?