Jenkins-Naudain v. ABM Industries Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Takina Jenkins-Naudain
Defendant: ABM Industries Inc., Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC dba Flowers Foods, ABM Industries Incorporated and Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC doing business as Flowers Foods
Case Number: 2:2022cv01826
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER.IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' motion to dismiss [ECF No. #16 ] and motion to compel arbitration [ECF No. #15 ] are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 7/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #29 Motion to Stay Discovery. In the event the motion to compel arbitration is denied, the parties must file a proposed discovery plan or joint status report within 14 days of the issuance of the order resolving that motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 24, 2023 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #29 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. (Sliker, Joshua)
March 23, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #29 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Plaintiff Takina Jenkins-Naudain. Replies due by 3/30/2023. (Gabroy, Christian)
March 21, 2023 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/2023. Pending before the Court is a motion to stay discovery. Docket No. 25. Any response must be filed by March 23, 2023, and any reply must be filed by March 24, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
March 20, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay Discovery re #15 Motion to Compel, by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brady, Katlyn)
March 20, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (TRW)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying #26 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/11/2023. Motions due by 8/10/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) Modified on 3/22/2023 (TRW).
March 17, 2023 Filing 26 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Takina Jenkins-Naudain.. (Gabroy, Christian)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying #17 Motion to Stay. Any renewed motion to stay discovery must be complete in of itself and the subsequent briefing must specifically address whether discovery should be stayed pending resolution of the motion to compel arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
February 1, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #17 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brady, Katlyn)
February 1, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #16 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brady, Katlyn)
February 1, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Compel, by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brady, Katlyn)
January 31, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/17/2023.(Brady, Katlyn) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 26, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Plaintiff Takina Jenkins-Naudain. Replies due by 2/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Index of Exhibits)(Gabroy, Christian)
January 26, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Takina Jenkins-Naudain. Replies due by 2/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Index of Exhibits)(Gabroy, Christian)
January 26, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Takina Jenkins-Naudain. Replies due by 2/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Index of Exhibits)(Gabroy, Christian)
January 12, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brady, Katlyn)
January 12, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brady, Katlyn)
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brady, Katlyn) (arbitration)
January 11, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 1/11/2023 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Pla Counsel: Christian Gabroy, Esq.; Kaine Messer, Esq.; Plaintiff Takina Jenkins-Naudain; Def Counsel: Katlyn M. Brady, Esq.; Luke Lindberg, Esq.; Steven Moulds Esq.; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM - 1:00 PM; (no image attached) The court met and conferred with the parties and counsel. A settlement agreement was not reached. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case returns to the normal litigation track.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second request). ABM Industries Incorporated and Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC Answer re #1 Petition due 1/31/2023. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint re #10 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC. (Brady, Katlyn) (extend) (answer)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC.. (Brady, Katlyn)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. ABM Industries Incorporated, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC answer due 12/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant ABM Industries Incorporated. (Brady, Katlyn) (extend) (answer)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/11/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 11/1/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/16/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
November 1, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC dba Flowers Foods that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Flowers Bakeries, LLC, Corporate Parent Flowers Foods, Inc. for Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC dba Flowers Foods added. (Brady, Katlyn)
October 31, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ABM Industries Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brady, Katlyn)
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Takina Jenkins-Naudain. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gabroy, Christian)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-22-858837-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7099770) by ABM Industries Inc., Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC dba Flowers Foods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sliker, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins-Naudain v. ABM Industries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takina Jenkins-Naudain
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industries Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Represented By: Katlyn M Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC dba Flowers Foods
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Represented By: Katlyn M Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Represented By: Katlyn M Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson, LLC doing business as Flowers Foods
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Represented By: Katlyn M Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?