International Markets Live, Inc. v. IMONITIE et al
Plaintiff: International Markets Live, Inc. and International Markets Live, Inc. doing business as IM Mastery Academy
Defendant: DAVID IMONITIE, SPELA SLUGA, DEVON ROESER, ILYKIT, LLC, NVISIONU, INC., Lucas Longmire, Michael Zhor, Imran Richie, Justin Owens, Paulo Cavalleri, Jose Miguel Contreas, Bass Grant, Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank, Gary McSween, Katrina Worgess, Luis Ronaldo Harnandez Arriaga, Stephania Ayo, Silvia Ayo, Catalina Vasquez, Mathias Vasquez, Vince Murphy and Nathan Samuel
Respondent: BFX Standard, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Ivan Tapia
Counter Defendant: Christopher Terry
Case Number: 2:2022cv01863
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #230 Report and Recommendation, is ADOPTED in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other motions pending before the Court are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is hereby remanded to the Eighth Judicial District Court for Clark County, Nevada, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi - cc: Certified copy of order and public docket sheet mailed to state court.)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 REPLY to Response to #244 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 RESPONSE to #244 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 8/28/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE RE R& R (ECF No. 230) Ripe for Adjudication by International Markets Live, Inc. re #230 Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Report and Recommendation,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,.. (Evensen, Lars)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/17/2023. Re: 202 Minute Order. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the hearing scheduled for August 24, 2023 at 1:00 P.M. is hereby VACATED. In the judgment of the Court, if the hearing cannot be decided on the briefing, the hearing will be rescheduled. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document re #236 Objection to Report and Recommendation, #241 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 8/31/2023. (Slighting, Bradley) (presiding)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 REPLY to Response to #222 Motion for Protective Order, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 RESPONSE to Objection to #230 Report and Recommendation and ECF No. 236 by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Evensen, Lars)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Granting #240 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file a reply to #222 Motion for Protective Order. Replies due by 8/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Filing Reply to Response to Defendants' Joint Motion for Protective Order re #233 Response by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (nondispositive)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #238 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Reply re #222 Motion for Protective Order. Replies due by 8/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #233 Response by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (nondispositive)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 REPLY to Response to #203 Motion to Compel by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia, Defendant Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 OBJECTION to #230 Report and Recommendation by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia.. Response to Objections to R&R due by 8/8/2023. (Slighting, Bradley)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing of Reply to #203 Motion to Compel. Replies due by 7/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR FILING OF REPLY TO RESPONSE (ECF No. 229) TO MOTION TO COMPEL (ECF NO. 203) (FIRST REQUEST) re #229 Response, by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia, Defendant Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (nondispositive)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 RESPONSE to #222 Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 7/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Evensen, Lars)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/18/2023. The hearing on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order #222 currently scheduled for September 29, 2023 is hereby VACATED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Denying #76 Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to sever non-diverse Defendants is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that this action be REMANDED for lack of diversity jurisdiction. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 7/18/2023 is VACATED. Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 RESPONSE to #203 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 7/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Evensen, Lars)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SUR-REPLY to #185 Reply to #181 Response to #164 Motion by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley) Modified on 7/12/2023 (HAM).
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Granting #225 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 8/27/2024. Motions due by 9/26/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/11/2023. Regarding ECF No. #222 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order: Motion hearing is set for 9/29/2023 at 10:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. To appear remotely by Zoom video conference, parties are kindly directed to contact courtroom administrator Jeff Miller at jeff_miller@nvd.uscourts.gov no later than noon on the day before the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Fifth Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Summons and First Amended Complaint on Foreign Defendants by Alternative Means Pursuant to FRCP 4(f) by International Markets Live, Inc. re #147 Ex Parte Motion,,,.. (Evensen, Lars)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. . (Evensen, Lars)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 7/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Granting #220 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to #203 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 7/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 220 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #203 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars) (extend) (nondispositive)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/3/2023. ORDER granting in part and denying in part #198 Motion to Strike.Before the Court is Defendants motion seeking to strike certain portions of Plaintiffs reply at ECF No. 185, which relates to Plaintiffs request to establish an ESI protocol. ECF No. 198. Plaintiffs opposed at ECF No. 211 and Defendants replied at ECF No. 216. The Court will construe Defendants motion as seeking leave to file a sur-reply and grant the request. The Court will not strike any portions of Plaintiffs reply at ECF No. 185. The sur-reply is due July 12, 2023.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/3/2023. The hearing regarding ECF No. #164 Plaintiff's Motion to Establish ESI Protocol in Furtherance of Discovery set for 7/18/2023 is continued in time only to 2:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. To appear remotely, parties are kindly directed to contact courtroom administrator Jeff Miller at jeff_miller@nvd.uscourts.gov no later than noon on the day before the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SCHEDULING ORDER finding as moot #210 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Motions terminated: #210 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by International Markets Live, Inc. Moot per #213 , original motion amended to correct error. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 REPLY to Response to #198 Motion to Strike, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 215 REPLY to Response to #197 Motion for Sanctions, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 214 RESPONSE to #201 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Evensen, Lars)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Granting #212 Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Motions due by 7/29/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
June 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 211 RESPONSE to #198 Motion to Strike, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 7/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lin, Jenapher)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Fourth Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #209 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Granting #205 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 6/28/2023. Motions due by 7/29/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting ECF No. #204 Second Stipulated Joinder to Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE to #197 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. Replies due by 6/28/2023. (Slighting, Bradley)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Fourth Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Second STIPULATION and Order Regarding Joinder to Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Evensen, Lars) (other) (protective)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION to Compel by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia, Defendant Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 7/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley) (discovery)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/16/2023. Regarding ECF No. #201 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery: Motion hearing is set for 8/24/2023 at 1:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. To appear remotely, parties are kindly directed to contact courtroom administrator Jeff Miller at jeff_miller@nvd.uscourts.gov no later than noon on the day before the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank, Justin Owens. Responses due by 6/28/2023. (Slighting, Bradley)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REPLY to Response to #191 Motion for Protective Order, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of ILYKIT, LLC with Prejudice by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars) (dismissal)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Joint MOTION to Strike #185 Reply, #181 Response, #164 Motion, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley) (nondispositive)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Counter MOTION for Sanctions for Award of Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5)(B) re #191 Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (discovery) Responses due by 6/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Evensen, Lars)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 196 RESPONSE to #191 Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 6/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Evensen, Lars)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 RESPONSE to #173 Motion, #188 Response by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REPLY to #184 Response to #153 Motion to Dismiss #44 Counterclaim by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc. (Evensen, Lars) Modified on 6/6/2023 (HAM).
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE to #191 Motion for Protective Order, by Respondent BFX Standard, Inc.. Replies due by 6/13/2023. (Stanger, Michael)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION for Protective Order by Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia, Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 6/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/30/2023. Re: #164 MOTION to establish ESI Protocol in Furtherance of Discovery by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2023 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPLY to Response to #152 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE to #173 Motion by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 6/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Evensen, Lars)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 REPLY to Response to #157 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Justin Owens. (Slighting, Bradley)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPLY to Response to #156 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank. (Slighting, Bradley)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 REPLY to #181 Response to #164 Motion, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars) Modified - Linked to #181 Response on 5/26/2023 (KF).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RESPONSE to #153 Motion to Dismiss by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia. Replies due by 5/30/2023. (Slighting, Bradley)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #181 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (HAM)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Granting #180 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Replies to ECF NOS. #168 and #169 . Replies due by 5/26/2023. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE to #164 Motion, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia. Replies due by 5/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Slighting, Bradley)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Extension of Time for Filing of Defendants' Replies to Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 168 and 169) (First Request) re #168 Response, #169 Response, by Defendants Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank, Justin Owens. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (sumjgm)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part #161 Motion Setting Number of Depositions. Motion hearing set for May 22, 2023 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/19/2023. On May 1, 2023, the Court entered the 155 Minute Order providing Petitioner Adam Knight ("Petitioner") and Defendant ILYKIT, LLC until May 12, 2023, to file a corrected Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event. To date, Petitioner and Defendant ILYKIT, LLC have not filed a corrected Verified Petition, and the deadline to do so has passed. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #102 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice is DENIED. If Petitioner chooses to re-file the Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, Petitioner must repay the filing fee.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JCKC)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Granting #158 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/28/2024. Motions due by 3/29/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/18/2023. Re: #161 Motion, 163 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, the Court, finding that resolution of the Motion, ECF No. 161, appropriate on the briefing hereby VACATES the hearing scheduled Monday, May 22, 2023 at 10 a.m. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting #174 Stipulation for extension of time to file response and reply to #153 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/23/2023. Replies due by 6/6/2023. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Extension of Time for Filing of Papers Related to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss re #153 Motion to Dismiss, #166 Order on Stipulation,,, by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia, Defendant Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (sumjgm)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 RESPONSE to #152 Motion to Dismiss by Counter Claimant David Imonitie. Replies due by 5/23/2023. (Wellman, Chris)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY to Response to #161 Motion, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6)(Evensen, Lars)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Nathan Samuel. Responses due by 5/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LOE)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 RESPONSE to #161 Motion, by Counter Claimants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia, Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga. Replies due by 5/19/2023. (Slighting, Bradley)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE to #157 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 5/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Evensen, Lars)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE to #156 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 5/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Evensen, Lars)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank, Justin Owens. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Slighting, Bradley)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Granting #159 Stipulation for Extension of time to file response and reply to #152 Motion to Dismiss and #153 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/16/2023. Replies due by 5/30/2023. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 EX PARTE MOTION For Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Nathan Samuel re #67 Summons Issued, #47 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Evensen, Lars) (answer)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION to establish ESI Protocol in Furtherance of Discovery by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 5/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lars Evensen, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Evensen, Lars) (misc) (discovery)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/4/2023. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #162 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' responses to ECF No. #161 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Setting Number of Depositions Permitted under FRCP 30(a) are due by 5/12/2023. Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/17/2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a motion hearing regarding ECF No. #161 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Setting Number of Depositions Permitted under FRCP 30(a) is set for 5/22/2023 at 10:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. If parties wish to appear remotely, they are kindly directed to contact courtroom administrator Jeff Miller at jeff_miller@nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 First MOTION to Shorten Time On Motion For Order Setting Number of Depositions To Be Taken re #161 Motion, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Evensen, Lars) (discovery)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION For Order Setting Number of Depositions Permitted Under FRCP 30(a) by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Evensen, Lars) (misc) (discovery)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #66 Summons Issued, #147 Ex Parte Motion,,, #47 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and [Proposed] Order Re: Extension of Time for Filing of Papers Related to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 152 and 153) re #153 Motion to Dismiss, #152 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Bass Grant, David Imonitie, Lucas Longmire, Vince Murphy, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Counter Claimant David Imonitie. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (sumjgm)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Third Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #37 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, #126 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Defendants Bass Grant, David Imonitie, Lucas Longmire, Vince Murphy, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Counter Claimant David Imonitie.. (Slighting, Bradley)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Justin Owens. Responses due by 5/15/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/11/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank. Responses due by 5/15/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/11/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/1/2023. Pending before the Court is the #102 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Adam Knight (Petitioner). On February 13, 2023, the Court notified Petitioner of deficiencies in the Verified Petition (See Min. Order, ECF No. 103 ) and Defendant ILYKIT, LLC promptly and timely filed the #107 Supplemental Motion for Appointment of Counsel Adam Knight. However, the Clerks Office terminated the #107 Motion and instructed Defendant ILYKIT, LLC to refile it as a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to the #102 Verified Petition (See Clerks Notice, ECF No. 110 ). To date, neither Petitioner nor Defendant ILYKIT, LLC has filed the corrected Verified Petition as instructed by the Clerks Office. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #102 Verified Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until May 12, 2023, to file a corrected Verified Petition using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies will result in the denial of the Verified Petition and Petitioners requirement to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JCKC)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE (Three Day) of Intent to Take Default Against Defendant Nathan Samuel by International Markets Live, Inc. re #134 Summons Returned Executed, #47 Amended Complaint.. (Evensen, Lars)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Dismiss #44 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 5/2/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Dismiss #128 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 5/2/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE Joint Notice of Updated Information Re Statement Regarding Removal (ECF NO. 18) by Bass Grant, David Imonitie, Lucas Longmire, Vince Murphy, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga re #145 Notice (Other), #18 Statement in Removal Case.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank, Justin Owens on 4/14/2023 executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #66 Summons Issued, #47 Amended Complaint. (Evensen, Lars)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Without Prejudice As To Defendant Michael Zhor. (Evensen, Lars)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #146 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve Summons and First Amended Complaint on Foreign Defendants by Alternative Means Pursuant to FRCPJ 4(f) by Counter Defendant International Markets Live, Inc., Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)(Evensen, Lars) (presiding)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE (Three Day) To Take Default Against Defendant Nathan Samuel by International Markets Live, Inc. re #134 Summons Returned Executed, #47 Amended Complaint.. (Evensen, Lars)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Updated Information Re Statement Regarding Removal (ECF No. 18) by Bass Grant, David Imonitie, Lucas Longmire, Vince Murphy, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #120 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, #131 Ex Parte Motion,. Jeff Cruishank served on 3/21/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #120 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, #131 Ex Parte Motion,. (Evensen, Lars) Modified on 3/31/2023 (WJ).
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #120 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, #131 Ex Parte Motion,. (Evensen, Lars)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #120 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, #131 Ex Parte Motion,. (Evensen, Lars)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #120 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, #131 Ex Parte Motion,. Angela Cruishank served on 3/22/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #120 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, #131 Ex Parte Motion,. Jeff Cruishank served on 3/22/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ANSWER to #128 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by International Markets Live, Inc..(Evensen, Lars)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 133 Order on Ex Parte Motion, 132 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Joinder to Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Evensen, Lars) (other) (protective)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #67 Summons Issued, #120 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint. Nathan Samuel served on 3/15/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 EX PARTE MOTION For Leave to Serve by Alternative Means re #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Evensen, Lars) (presiding)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 First EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time for Service Under FRCP 4(m) re #47 Amended Complaint, #66 Summons Issued, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Evensen, Lars) (presiding)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. of Imran Ritchie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Evensen, Lars)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Markets Live, Inc. and Christopher Terry by David Imonitie. (HAM)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/8/2023. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall detach and separately file ECF No. 114-3. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EmG)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting #120 Second Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/1/2023. Motions due by 10/2/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REPLY to Response to #99 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Vince Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chris Wellman, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chris Wellman, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Chris Wellman, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Chris Wellman)(Wellman, Chris)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPLY to Response to #98 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Vince Murphy. (Wellman, Chris)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY to Response to #89 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Bass Grant. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chris Wellman, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chris Wellman, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Chris Wellman, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Chris Wellman)(Wellman, Chris)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY to Response to #88 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Lucas Longmire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Dec. of Wellman, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Dec. of Wellman, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Dec. of Wellman, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Dec. of Wellman)(Wellman, Chris)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REPLY to Response to #87 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Bass Grant, Lucas Longmire. (Wellman, Chris)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Second Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #66 Summons Issued, #47 Amended Complaint. Imran Richie served on 12/22/2022. (Evensen, Lars)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #113 Stipulation Re: ECF NOS. #87 , #88 , #89 , #98 and #99 . Replies due by 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Terry re #44 Counterclaim. (HAM)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Entry of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order Denying Motion to Vacate Order Entered on 11-14-22 Regarding Motion to Show Cause Why Stipulating Defendants Should Not Be Held In Contempt of Court For Violating Stipulated Order Granting Injunction and For Sanctions Thereof on OST by State Court by International Markets Live, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Evensen, Lars)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Unopposed Motion to Allow Defendant David Imonitie to Add Counterclaim to His Answer to the First Amended Complaint re #47 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Joint UNOPPOSED MOTION to Allow Defendant David Imonitie to Add Counterclaim to His Answer to the First Amended Complaint re #47 Amended Complaint by Defendant David Imonitie. Responses due by 3/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Slighting, Bradley) (answer)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Re: Defendants Bass Grant, Lucas Longmire and Vince Murphy's Request for Extension of Time to File Their Replies to Plaintiff's Responses (ECF Nos. 104, 105, 106, 111 and 112) to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 87, 88, 89, 98 and 99) re #104 Response, #105 Response, #109 Errata, #112 Response, #98 Motion to Dismiss, #88 Motion to Dismiss, #99 Motion to Dismiss, #108 Errata, #89 Motion to Dismiss, #106 Response, #87 Motion to Dismiss, #111 Response by Defendants Bass Grant, Lucas Longmire, Vince Murphy. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (nondispositive)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE to #99 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 2/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Evensen, Lars)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE to #98 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 2/23/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #107 Supplemental Motion. Counsel is advised to refile as a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #102 , as ordered in ecf 103. (no image attached) (EDS)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ERRATA to #106 Response, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ERRATA to #105 Response, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Supplemental MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Adam Knight by Defendant ILYKIT, LLC. (Field, Jon)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to #89 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 2/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Evensen, Lars)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE to #88 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 2/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Evensen, Lars)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE to #87 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 2/20/2023. (Evensen, Lars)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/13/2023. Pending before the Court is the #102 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Adam O. Knight ("Petitioner"). The #102 Verified Petition contains three errors. First, Petitioner does not include a Certificate of Good Standing from the highest admitting court of Tennessee, the state in which he claims he is admitted to practice law. Petitioner is required to include Certificates of Good Standing issued within six months before the date of filing a verified petition from the highest admitting court of each state in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law. LR IA 11-2(b)(3). Second, Petitioner fails to sign his name on page 4. Third, Petitioner fails to provide proof by signature from a Notary Public or Clerk of Court on page 4 that he has sworn the information on the #102 Verified Petition is true and correct. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #102 Verified Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until February 27, 2023, to correct these deficiencies by filing a CORRECTED Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy these deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the #102 Verified Petition and Petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EH)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam Knight and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jon Field (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7204681) by Defendant ILYKIT, LLC. (Field, Jon)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Christopher Terry by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vince Murphy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Slighting, Bradley)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss #47 Amended Complaint by Defendant Vince Murphy. Responses due by 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss #47 Amended Complaint by Defendant Vince Murphy. Responses due by 2/16/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/19/2023. (Slighting, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #94 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #95 Stipulation Re: #88 Motion to Dismiss and #89 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/13/2023. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #88 Motion to Dismiss, #89 Motion to Dismiss, #87 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars) (extend) (sumjgm)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Deposition of Dwight Francis by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY to Response to #76 Motion to Strike, by Defendants David Imonitie, Ivan Tapia, Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/27/2023. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #91 is DENIED without prejudice, as it is unclear to the Court whether any of the Defendants who have not joined this motion oppose it. Accordingly, the parties must meet and confer. The parties may then file a stipulation or joint motion, indicating whether any Defendants oppose the motion.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint MOTION to Allow Defendant David Imonitie to Add Counterclaim to His Answer to the First Amended Complaint by Defendant David Imonitie. Responses due by 2/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Answer to FAC and Counterclaim)(Slighting, Bradley) (misc) (answer)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bass Grant, Lucas Longmire. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Slighting, Bradley)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss #47 Amended Complaint by Defendant Bass Grant. Responses due by 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss #47 Amended Complaint by Defendant Lucas Longmire. Responses due by 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Slighting, Bradley)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss #47 Amended Complaint by Defendants Bass Grant, Lucas Longmire. Responses due by 2/6/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/9/2023. (Slighting, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE to #76 Motion to Strike, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Lin, Jenapher)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting #84 Joint Motion to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendant Vince Murphy to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #47 First Amended Complaint. Vince Murphy answer due 2/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendant Vince Murphy to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint re #47 Amended Complaint by Defendant Vince Murphy. Responses due by 1/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slighting, Bradley) (answer)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Vince Murphy.. (Slighting, Bradley)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to #44 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by International Markets Live, Inc..(Evensen, Lars)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin L. James for Ivan Tapia and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Slighting. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/12/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Justin L James and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley S Slighting (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7170372) by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia, Defendant Ivan Tapia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing -- Utah State Bar)(Slighting, Bradley)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Extend Time Re: #47 Amended Complaint. Bass Grant answer due 1/23/2023; Lucas Longmire answer due 1/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendants Bass Grant and Lucas Longmire to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint re #47 Amended Complaint by Defendants Bass Grant, Lucas Longmire. Responses due by 1/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley) (answer)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Bass Grant, Lucas Longmire.. (Slighting, Bradley)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Strike #47 Amended Complaint by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia, Defendant Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Slighting, Bradley) (pleading)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Stipulation Re: #44 Counterclaim, Ivan Tapia answer due 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #35 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #47 Amended Complaint. Vince Murphy served on 12/30/2022. (Evensen, Lars)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/4/2023. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #71 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer about Defendants' motion. See LR 16-1(d). If the parties cannot reach a resolution, Defendants may refile their motion with a meet-and-confer certification. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to Respond to Counterclaim by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars) (extend) (answer)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to Strike #47 Amended Complaint by Counter Claimant Ivan Tapia, Defendant Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Slighting, Bradley) (pleading)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #66 Summons Issued,. Bass Grant served on 12/23/2022. (Evensen, Lars)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re #47 Amended Complaint. Lucas Longmire served on 12/21/2022. (Evensen, Lars)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nathan Samuel. (DRS)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Silvia Ayo, Stephania Ayo, Paulo Cavalleri, Angela Cruishank, Jeff Cruishank, Bass Grant, Luis Ronaldo Harnandez Arriaga, Lucas Longmire, Gary McSween, Jose Miguel Contreas, Vince Murphy, Justin Owens, Imran Richie, Catalina Vasquez, Mathias Vasquez, Katrina Worgess, Michael Zhor re #47 Amended Complaint. (KF)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Party Nathan Samuel added as a Defendant. This defendant's name was left out of the Caption on the #47 Amended Complaint as well as the lead paragraph on page 2, naming the parties. Defendant's name was located on page 3 at line 10 of the complaint. Defendant added to the docket and summons shall issue. (DRS)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Michael Zhor by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Nathan Samuel by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Imran Ritchie by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Paolo Cavalleri by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Jose Miguel Contreas by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Justin Owens by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Bass Grant by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Vince Murphy by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Gary McSween by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Katrina Worgess by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Luis Ronaldo Hernandez Arriaga by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Stephania Ayo by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Sylvia Ayo by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Catalina Vasquez by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Mathias Vasquez by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Lucas Longmire by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Jeff Cruishank by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Angela Cruishank by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by International Markets Live, Inc.. Adds new parties. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 WITHDRAWAL of #41 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Evensen, Lars)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Party Vince Murphy added in accordance with #47 FAC. (DRS)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #32 Motion, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga. (Slighting, Bradley)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against International Markets Live, Inc. by Ivan Tapia. filed by Ivan Tapia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Slighting, Bradley)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chris Wellman for David Imonitie, Chris Wellman for Devon Roeser, Chris Wellman for Spela Sluga,Chris Wellman for Ivan Tapia and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Slighting. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/13/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE to #32 Motion, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Replies due by 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Evensen, Lars)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 12/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Evensen, Lars) (pleading)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, #30 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, for attorney Chris Wellman, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing - CD of California, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing - ED of California, #3 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing - 11th Cir Court of Appeals, #4 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing - State Bar of California)(Slighting, Bradley)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal. Ivan Tapia answer due 12/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #35 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 9/1/2023. Motions due by 10/2/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint re #9 Stipulation by Defendant Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (answer)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/5/2022. Before the Court is the #30 Notice of Corrected Image/Document ("Corrected Verified Petition"), relating back to the #10 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Chris A. Wellman ("Petitioner"). On November 17, 2022, the Court notified Petitioner that if he did not file a corrected Verified Petition that included all applicable Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting courts of each state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, the Court would deny the #10 Verified Petition. (See Min. Order, ECF No. 14 ). Although Petitioner's #30 Corrected Verified Petition includes Certificates of Good Standing from various federal courts, it does not include a Certificate of Good Standing from the highest admitting court of the State of California, the state in which Petitioner indicates he is a member of the bar. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #10 Verified Petition one last time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until December 15, 2022, to file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event that includes all applicable Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting courts of each state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law. See LR IA 11-2(b)(3). Failure to timely remedy the deficiency WILL result in the denial of the #10 Verified Petition and Petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EH)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Clarification Regarding the State Courts November 14, 2022 Order Regarding Motion to Show Cause Why Stipulating Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt of Court for Violating Stipulated Order Granting Injunction and for Sanctions Thereon on OST by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga. Responses due by 12/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley) (misc) (nondispositive)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant ILYKIT, LLC. (Field, Jon)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Chris A. Wellman, by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing - CA Eastern, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing - CA Central, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Standing - Court of Appeals 11th Circuit)(Slighting, Bradley)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/28/2022. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #26 Defendant Ivan Tapia's Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer in good faith about Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint and Defendant's request for an extension of time by 12/5/2022. To the extent the parties cannot reach an agreement, Defendant may refile his motion. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/28/2022. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. The parties are ordered to meet and confer by 12/5/2022 about Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint. See LR 16-1(d). If the parties cannot agree, Plaintiff may refile its motion with a meet-and-confer certification consistent with the Local Rules.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE (Three Day) To Take Default Against Defendant Ivan Tapia by International Markets Live, Inc... (Evensen, Lars)
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #12 Order on Stipulation,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings by Defendant Ivan Tapia. Responses due by 12/8/2022. (Slighting, Bradley) (answer)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/23/2022. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Establish ESI Protocol in Furtherance of Expedited Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer in good faith on an ESI protocol. To the extent any provisions cannot be agreed upon, Plaintiff may refile its motion.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Evensen, Lars)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE Of Non-Opposition To #5 Motion To Remand (ECF No. 5) By Defendants David Imonitie, Spela Sluga, Devon Roeser, NVISIONU, Inc., and ILYKIT, LLC by International Markets Live, Inc. re #5 Motion to Remand to State Court,.. (Evensen, Lars) Modified/linked to underlying motion on 11/22/2022 (DRS).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss,, #8 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kyle Lowe, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Evensen, Lars)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION For Leave To File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Evensen, Lars) (misc) (pleading)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendant Ivan Tapia. Replies due by 11/28/2022. (Slighting, Bradley)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendant Ivan Tapia. Replies due by 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Slighting, Bradley)
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Ivan Tapia.. (Slighting, Bradley)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION To Establish ESI Protocol in Furtherance of Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Evensen, Lars) (misc) (discovery)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Minutes of the Court by David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia re #4 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minutes of the Court)(Slighting, Bradley)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion to Vacate Order Entered On November 14, 2022 Regarding Motion To Show Cause Why Stipulating Defendants Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of Court For Violating Stipulated Order Granting Injunction And For Sanctions Thereof On OST by David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/17/2022. Before the Court is the #10 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Chris A. Wellman ("Petitioner"). The #10 Petition indicates that Petitioner has been admitted to practice law in California but did not provide a Certificate of Good Standing from the highest admitting court of California. Petitioner is required to include Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting courts of each state in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law, as required by this Districts Local Rule IA 11-2(b)(3). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #10 Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until November 30, 2022, to file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event that includes all applicable Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting courts of each state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law. Failure to timely remedy the deficiency WILL result in the denial of the #10 Petition and Petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EH)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Order by State Court by International Markets Live, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Evensen, Lars)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal, Ivan Tapia answer due 11/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, #8 Notice (Other) by Defendant ILYKIT, LLC. Responses due by 11/28/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Field, Jon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 View Corrected Image at #40 #30 ]: MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Chris A. Wellman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley S. Slighting (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7113752) by Defendants David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga. (Slighting, Bradley) Modified on 11/30/2022 (DRS). Modified on 12/12/2022 as a SECOND corrected image has been filed. (DRS).
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Ivan Tapia. (Slighting, Bradley) (extend) (answer)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga re #1 Petition for Removal,,.. (Slighting, Bradley)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by International Markets Live, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Evensen, Lars)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney update in case: Attorney Jenapher Lin added for Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc. as listed on the #5 Motion. (SLD)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First MOTION to Shorten Time re #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lars K. Evensen)(Evensen, Lars) (presiding)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Evensen, Lars)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/4/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/19/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David Imonitie, NVISIONU, INC., Devon Roeser, Spela Sluga, Ivan Tapia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Slighting, Bradley)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-854783-B, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7105547) by Ivan Tapia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index Index, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Business Court Order, #5 Exhibit Order for Service by Electronic Means, #6 Exhibit Notice of Entry of Order for Service by Electronic Means, #7 Exhibit New York Department of State Printout) (Slighting, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Markets Live, Inc. v. IMONITIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Markets Live, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Markets Live, Inc. doing business as IM Mastery Academy
Represented By: Lars K. Evensen
Represented By: P. Sterling Kerr
Represented By: George E Robinson
Represented By: Jenapher Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID IMONITIE
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Chris Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPELA SLUGA
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Chris Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON ROESER
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Chris Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILYKIT, LLC
Represented By: Jon E. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVISIONU, INC.
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Longmire
Represented By: Chris Wellman
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zhor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imran Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Owens
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulo Cavalleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Miguel Contreas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Grant
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Chris Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Cruishank
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cruishank
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McSween
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Worgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Ronaldo Harnandez Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephania Ayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Ayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalina Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathias Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Murphy
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Chris Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ivan Tapia
Represented By: Chris Wellman
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Justin L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Christopher Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BFX Standard, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Stanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?