Contorelli v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tristan Michael Contorelli and Ramai Christine Contorelli
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO
Case Number: 2:2022cv01867
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Kim, Henry)
December 13, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Tristan Michael Contorelli. Replies due by 12/20/2022. (Seegmiller, Clark)
November 29, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tristan Michael Contorelli re #9 Amended Complaint. (Seegmiller, Clark)
November 28, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/12/2022. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GEICO Advantage Insurance Company re #9 Amended Complaint. (TRW)
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to GEICO Advantage Insurance Company by Plaintiff Tristan Michael Contorelli. (Seegmiller, Clark)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice as to Plaintiff Ramai Christine Controelli only. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEICO Advantage Insurance Company by Tristan Michael Contorelli. No changes to parties. (Seegmiller, Clark)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tristan Michael Contorelli. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Seegmiller, Clark)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO DISMISS Ramai Contorelli Only by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan) (dismiss)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/24/2022. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/4/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/19/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company for GEICO Advantage Insurance Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-22-858754-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7106116) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 4, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contorelli v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Michael Contorelli
Represented By: David Menocal
Represented By: Clark Seegmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramai Christine Contorelli
Represented By: David Menocal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Frank A. Toddre, II
Represented By: Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?