Iovino et al v. AmTrust Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carmen Iovino and TopNotch Services, Inc.
Defendant: AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. and Security National Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv01974
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for extension of time to file reply re #14 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 1/27/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re #15 Response by Defendant AmTrust Financial Services, Inc.. (Thome, Sheri) (extend) (sumjgm)
January 17, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Carmen Iovino, TopNotch Services, Inc.. Replies due by 1/24/2023. (Simon, Daniel)
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint by Defendant AmTrust Financial Services, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A)(Thome, Sheri)
December 29, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Security National Insurance Company. (LOE)
December 29, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Carmen Iovino. (Simon, Daniel)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant AmTrust Financial Services, Inc... (Thome, Sheri)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying as Moot #6 Motion to Dismiss, because it is directed at the original complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
December 20, 2022 Party Security National Insurance Company added pursuant to #8 Amended Complaint. (DRS)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Carmen Iovino. Replies due by 12/26/2022. (Simon, Daniel)
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Carmen Iovino. Adds new parties. (Simon, Daniel)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant AmTrust Financial Services, Inc... (Thome, Sheri)
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant AmTrust Financial Services, Inc.. Responses due by 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A)(Thome, Sheri)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2022. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/14/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
November 29, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (LOE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carmen Iovino. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Simon, Daniel)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Security National Insurance Company for AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. added. (Thome, Sheri)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-860592-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7128598) by AmTrust Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Thome, Sheri) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iovino et al v. AmTrust Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Iovino
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ferrel
Represented By: Benjamin J Miller
Represented By: Daniel S Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TopNotch Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ferrel
Represented By: Benjamin J Miller
Represented By: Daniel S Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Represented By: Carlos Blumberg
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?