Alexander et al v. The Croix Townhomes LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Alexander and Alma Alexander
Defendant: The Croix Townhomes LLC, Gaines Investment Trust, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, Pam Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust and Lizbeth Estrada
Case Number: 2:2022cv02051
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cristina D Silva
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Responses re #17 Motion to Dismiss due by 2/13/2023. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 2/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
February 3, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Alma Alexander, Kevin Alexander. (Brown, Alexis) (extend) (sumjgm)
January 30, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #13 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Alma Alexander, Kevin Alexander. (Brown, Alexis)
January 23, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendants Lizbeth Estrada, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, The Croix Townhomes LLC. Responses due by 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1)(Edwards, F.)
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Lizbeth Estrada, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, The Croix Townhomes LLC. Replies due by 1/30/2023. (Edwards, F.)
January 20, 2023 Filing 15 Defendant Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust's Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,,, filed by Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2023.(Edwards, F.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 11, 2023 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendants Lizbeth Estrada, Gaines Investment Trust, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, The Croix Townhomes LLC.. (Edwards, F.)
January 9, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Plaintiffs Alma Alexander, Kevin Alexander. Responses due by 1/23/2023. (Brown, Alexis)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Lizbeth Estrada, Gaines Investment Trust, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, Pam Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, and The Croix Townhomes LLC answer due 1/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To File Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) Responsive Pleading re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant The Croix Townhomes LLC. (Lujan, Jessica) (extend) (answer)
December 29, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Alexander, Alma Alexander. Lizbeth Estrada waiver sent on 11/10/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Brown, Alexis)
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Alexander, Alma Alexander. Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust waiver sent on 11/10/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Brown, Alexis)
December 29, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Alexander, Alma Alexander. The Croix Townhomes LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Brown, Alexis)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Lizbeth Estrada, Gaines Investment Trust, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, The Croix Townhomes LLC.. (Edwards, F.)
December 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Pam Gaines as Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust by Defendant The Croix Townhomes LLC.. (Lujan, Jessica)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Lizbeth Estrada, Gaines Investment Trust, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, Pam Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, The Croix Townhomes LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 DKT 3 - Minute Order in Chambers)(Edwards, F.)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/12/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/27/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 12, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lizbeth Estrada, Gaines Investment Trust, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, The Croix Townhomes LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Edwards, F.)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-861082-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7141893) by Gaines Investment Trust, Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust, The Croix Townhomes LLC, Lizbeth Estrada. Proof of service due by 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Exhibit C - Notices of Commencement of Action and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons) (Edwards, F.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. The Croix Townhomes LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Alexander
Represented By: Alexis L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Alexander
Represented By: Alexis L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Croix Townhomes LLC
Represented By: F. Thomas Edwards
Represented By: Jessica M Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaines Investment Trust
Represented By: F. Thomas Edwards
Represented By: Jessica M Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald B. Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust
Represented By: F. Thomas Edwards
Represented By: Jessica M Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Gaines, Co-Trustee of the Gaines Investment Trust
Represented By: F. Thomas Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizbeth Estrada
Represented By: F. Thomas Edwards
Represented By: Jessica M Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?