GF Investments LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: GF Investments LLC
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper, Riversource Life Insurance Company, Joseph A Albano, Debra M. Albano and Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 2:2023cv00145
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re #8 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens and #7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/6/2023. Replies due by 4/20/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 22, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #8 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff GF Investments LLC. (Beede, Michael) (extend) (sumjgm)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re #8 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens and #7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/23/2023. Replies due by 4/6/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 1, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #8 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff GF Investments LLC. (Beede, Michael) (extend) (sumjgm)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendants Joseph A. Albano and Debra M. Albano. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Joseph A. Albano's and Debra M. Albano's right, title, estate, lien, claim, or interest in the Propertylocated at 10809 Garden Mist Drive, #2058, Las Vegas, NV 89135 (Clark County Assessor'sParcel Number 164-13-217-052) is extinguished and the Defendants shall be hereafter barredand enjoined from asserting any right, title, estate, lien, interest or claim, thereto.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants Joseph A. Albano and Debra M.Albano shall be dismissed from the Action with prejudice, with each Party to bear their ownattorney's fees and costs.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants JosephA. Albano and Debra M. Albano on 2/16/2023 is hereby denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
February 28, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Defendants Joseph A. Albano and Debra M. Albano by Plaintiff GF Investments LLC. (Beede, Michael) (dismissal)
February 27, 2023 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff GF Investments LLC.. (Beede, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GF Investments LLC. Debra M. Albano served on 1/27/2023. (Beede, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GF Investments LLC. Joseph A Albano served on 1/27/2023. (Beede, Michael)
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Debra M. Albano, Joseph A Albano. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Amin, Ismail)
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Debra M. Albano, Joseph A Albano. Responses due by 3/2/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Final Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service)(Amin, Ismail) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re #8 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens and #7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/2/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
February 14, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #8 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff GF Investments LLC. (Beede, Michael) (extend) (sumjgm)
February 7, 2023 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Wight, Brody)
February 2, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Wight, Brody)
February 2, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Wight, Brody)
February 2, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GF Investments LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Goober Foundation Properties, Ltd., Other Affiliate Adam Hartford Seward for GF Investments LLC added.. (Beede, Michael)
February 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address and Notice of Firm Name Change by GF Investments LLC.. (Beede, Michael)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/27/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/11/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
January 26, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (TRW)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate RightPath Loans, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Champion Mortgage Company, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper, Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper added.. (Wight, Brody)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-862245-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7186753) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. Proof of service due by 3/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wight, Brody) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GF Investments LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GF Investments LLC
Represented By: Michael N. Beede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riversource Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A Albano
Represented By: Ismail Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra M. Albano
Represented By: Ismail Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?