Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4 et al v. Pomp & Whimsy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3, Rittvo Family LLC 3, Gastwirth Family Trust, Trustee Jason Gastwirth, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4 doing business as Rittvo Family Investments LLC 4, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3 doing business as Rittvo Family Investments LLC 3, Rittvo Family LLC 3 doing business as Rittvo Family Investments LLC 3 and Jason Gastwirth
Defendant: Pomp & Whimsy, Inc., Nicola Nice, Todd Gallopo and Nori-Ann DeLaCruz
Case Number: 2:2023cv00240
Filed: February 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Rittvo Family LLC 3, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4.. (Barron, David)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tarak Anada and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Barron (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7266953) by Plaintiffs Rittvo Family LLC 3, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4. (Barron, David)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Nori-Ann DeLaCruz, Todd Gallopo, Nicola Nice, Pomp & Whimsy, Inc.. (McCoy, Robert)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pomp & Whimsy, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (McCoy, Robert)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Nori-Ann DeLaCruz, Todd Gallopo, Nicola Nice, Pomp & Whimsy, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/3/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/8/2023.(McCoy, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rittvo Family LLC 3, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3, Gastwirth Family Trust, Jason Gastwirth. Nori-Ann DeLaCruz served on 2/19/2023. (Barron, David)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rittvo Family LLC 3, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3, Gastwirth Family Trust, Jason Gastwirth. Pomp & Whimsy, Inc. served on 2/16/2023. (Barron, David)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rittvo Family LLC 3. Todd Gallopo served on 2/16/2023. (Barron, David)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Barron, David)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nori-Ann DeLaCruz, Todd Gallopo, Nicola Nice, Pomp & Whimsy, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (KF)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Todd Gallopo by Plaintiff Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Barron, David)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Nori-Ann DeLaCruz by Plaintiff Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Barron, David)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Nicola Nice by Plaintiff Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Barron, David)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Defendant Pomp & Whimsy, Inc. by Plaintiff Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Barron, David)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7206895) by Rittvo Family LLC 3, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3, Gastwirth Family Trust, Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4, Jason Gastwirth. Proof of service due by 5/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Barron, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4 et al v. Pomp & Whimsy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rittvo Family LLC 3
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gastwirth Family Trust
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Jason Gastwirth
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 4 doing business as Rittvo Family Investments LLC 4
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rittvo Investment Fund LLC 3 doing business as Rittvo Family Investments LLC 3
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rittvo Family LLC 3 doing business as Rittvo Family Investments LLC 3
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Gastwirth
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pomp & Whimsy, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicola Nice
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Gallopo
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nori-Ann DeLaCruz
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?