Brian v United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Connell R Brian, Department of Veterans Affairs and Brian Connell
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 2:2023cv00245
Filed: February 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States Department of Veterans Affairs.. (Hanson, Stephen)
March 17, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/17/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 16, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Responses due by 3/30/2023. (Hanson, Stephen)
March 3, 2023 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States Department of Veterans Affairs.. (Hanson, Stephen)
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/16/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/3/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
February 15, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
February 15, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (KF)
February 15, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-864532-C, by Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (Hanson, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian v United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connell R Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Stephen Hanson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Stephen Hanson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?