Adams et al v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Adams, Christopher Longueira, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen and Nicholas Parker
Defendant: Jeremy Fox, Mhyleen Aquino Fox, Crystal Lynn Eller, Prodigy Fulfillment Center, Inc., Fidelity Law Center, Rivera Document Processing, LLC and Brian Lorenzo Rivera
Case Number: 2:2023cv00474
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crystal Lynn Eller, Fidelity Law Center, Jeremy Fox, Mhyleen Aquino Fox, Prodigy Fulfillment Center, Inc., Brian Lorenzo Rivera, Rivera Document Processing, LLC. (LOE)
April 17, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Brian Rivera aka Lorenzo Rivera by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Rivera Document Processing, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Fidelity Law Center by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Myleen Fox by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Jeremy Fox by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Prodigy Fulfillment Center by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Crystal Eller, Esq. Attorney at Law sole proprietorship by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Crystal Eller by Plaintiffs Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley, Sally Finley, Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. (Mains, Theresa)
April 17, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alicia Adams, Penny Brown, Roger Vincent Brown, Anthony Corbin, Joanne Demasi, Charles Finley. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Mains, Theresa)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Striking Certificate of Interested Parties. It is Ordered that the plaintiffs certificate of interested parties 4 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). The certificate does not identify the citizenship of the plaintiffs as required by the recent amendment to that rule. It Is Further ordered that the plaintiffs to file a proper certificate of interested parties by April 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
April 11, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Plaintiffs. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/18/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
March 31, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
March 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7253248) by Beverly Hargen, Estate of Joseph Hargen, Christopher Longueira, Nicholas Parker. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/10/2023. Proof of service due by 6/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 17) (Mains, Theresa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 31, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (LOE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Adams
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Longueira
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Brown
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Vincent Brown
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Corbin
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Demasi
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Finley
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Finley
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hargen
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Joseph Hargen
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Parker
Represented By: Theresa Lillian Mains
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mhyleen Aquino Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Lynn Eller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Fulfillment Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivera Document Processing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lorenzo Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?